Grulkowski v. Bakken Diesel, LLC
Plaintiff: Jerome Grulkowski
Defendant: Bakken Diesel, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00075
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have until 7/08/2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Bakken Diesel, LLC. (Bakke, Randall)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall J. Bakke on behalf of Bakken Diesel, LLC (Bakke, Randall)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jerome Grulkowski. (am)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Dunn County Sheriff filed by Jerome Grulkowski. Bakken Diesel, LLC served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (Weikum, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bakken Diesel, LLC. (am)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bakken Diesel, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000676) filed by Jerome Grulkowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) Modified on 5/8/2020 to add receipt number (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grulkowski v. Bakken Diesel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Grulkowski
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakken Diesel, LLC
Represented By: Grant Bakke
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?