Walker et al v. Willey et al
Plaintiff: L.L.W., E.G.W., Marinda Walker, N.B.R.W. and A.J.W.
Defendant: ND Energy Services Management, Inc. and Robert James Willey
Case Number: 1:2020cv00084
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #19 AFFIDAVIT. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE at #24 ; Clerks office also added exhibit description to attachment when refiling. (js)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
June 24, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by ND Energy Services Management, Inc., Robert James Willey. (cjs)
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Robert James Willey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/30/2020. (cjs)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to ND Energy Services Management, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/30/2020. (cjs)
June 17, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A.J.W., E.G.W., L.L.W., N.B.R.W., Marinda Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence Showing Electronic Service)(js)
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* AFFIDAVIT of Service by Electronic Means by A.J.W., E.G.W., L.L.W., N.B.R.W., Marinda Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Higgins, Kent) Modified on 7/19/2020 to restrict access. (js)
June 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Robert James Willey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2020. (cjs)
June 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to ND Energy Services Management, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2020. (cjs)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A.J.W., Marinda Walker, N.B.R.W., L.L.W., E.G.W.. Robert James Willey waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Higgins, Kent)
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A.J.W., Marinda Walker, N.B.R.W., L.L.W., E.G.W.. ND Energy Services Management, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Higgins, Kent)
May 29, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Notice of Appearance. Clerk's office added filer (Robert James Willey). (rh)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by A.J.W.. (cjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by E.G.W.. (cjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Marinda Walker. (cjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by L.L.W.. (cjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by N.B.R.W.. (cjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ND Energy Services Management, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of ND Energy Services Management, Inc., Robert James Willey (Hughes, John) Modified on 5/29/2020 to add filer (Robert James Willey). (rh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marinda Walker. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/4/2020. (rh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to N.B.R.W. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/4/2020. (rh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to L.L.W. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/4/2020. (rh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to E.G.W. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/4/2020. (rh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to A.J.W. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/4/2020. (rh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ND Energy Services Management, Inc., Robert James Willey. (rh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ND Energy Services Management, Inc., Robert James Willey (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000719) filed by A.J.W., Marinda Walker, N.B.R.W., L.L.W., E.G.W. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) Modified on 5/21/2020 to add receipt number. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Willey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ND Energy Services Management, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert James Willey
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.L.W.
Represented By: Kent A Higgins
Represented By: Thomas S Reavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.G.W.
Represented By: Kent A Higgins
Represented By: Thomas S Reavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marinda Walker
Represented By: Kent A Higgins
Represented By: Thomas S Reavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.B.R.W.
Represented By: Kent A Higgins
Represented By: Thomas S Reavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.J.W.
Represented By: Kent A Higgins
Represented By: Thomas S Reavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?