Lietzke v. Philadelphia, City of
Plaintiff: Bill Lietzke
Defendant: Philadelphia, City of
Case Number: 1:2020cv00086
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Bill Lietzke by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed to Plaintiff at PO Box 4732, Montgomery, AL 36104 on 6/23/2020 at (cjs).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor and referred to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. Distributed to Plaintiff at PO Box 4732, Montgomery, AL 36104. (rm)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Second Notice of Direct Assignment. Mail previously sent to alternative address. (rh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bill Lietzke. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/15/2020. (am)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bill Lietzke. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/4/2020. (rh) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/21/2020 to attach correct document.) (rh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philadelphia, City of (Filing fee NOT PAID) filed by Bill Lietzke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lietzke v. Philadelphia, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Lietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?