Hibbs et al v. Loenbro Pipeline, LLC
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Nasimok, Robert Hibbs, Michael Ramsey and Ashley Bailey
Defendant: Loenbro Pipeline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00099
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Loenbro Pipeline, LLC.(Svihovec, Nathan)
July 7, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and re-filed as WAIVER of Service Executed at #4 . (as)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cheyenne Nasimok, Robert Hibbs, Ashley Bailey, Michael Ramsey. Loenbro Pipeline, LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Certified Mail Receipt)(as)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheyenne Nasimok, Robert Hibbs, Ashley Bailey, Michael Ramsey. Loenbro Pipeline, LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Service)(Schneider, McLain) Modified on 7/7/2020 to restrict access. (as)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Loenbro Pipeline, LLC. (js)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Loenbro Pipeline, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000308) filed by Cheyenne Nasimok, Robert Hibbs, Ashley Bailey, Michael Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hibbs et al v. Loenbro Pipeline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Nasimok
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Kylie Michelle Oversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hibbs
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Kylie Michelle Oversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ramsey
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Kylie Michelle Oversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Bailey
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Kylie Michelle Oversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loenbro Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Nathan James Svihovec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?