Miller et al v. Juarez Cartel
Plaintiff: James Oliver Ray, Issac Anson Langford, Amelia Christine Sedgwick, William LeBaron, Laura LeBaron, Dayer LeBaron, Miguel LeBaron, Adriana Jones, Howard J. Miller, Kerah Ray, Javier LeBaron, Jonathan Sean Ray, Amber Ray, Elizabeth Ann Langford, Jaremy Ryan Ray, Justin Michael Ray, Tyler Edward Johnson, Serina Sharon Langford, Rholena Lian Johnson, Melissa Conklin, Ruthila LeBaron, Bathsheba Shalom Tucker, Laura Corina LeBaron, Adrian LeBaron-Soto and Karen Woolley
Defendant: Juarez Cartel, La Linea, Vicente Carrillo Fuentes Organization and CFO
Case Number: 1:2020cv00132
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #11 Motion for Service by Publication (BG)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Courtney R. Wolf. (js)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Courtney R. Wolf (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2024681) by Melissa Conklin, Rholena Lian Johnson, Tyler Edward Johnson, Adriana Jones, Elizabeth Ann Langford, Issac Anson Langford, Serina Sharon Langford, Dayer LeBaron, Javier LeBaron, Laura LeBaron, Miguel LeBaron, Ruthila LeBaron, William LeBaron, Adrian LeBaron-Soto, Howard J. Miller, Amber Ray, James Oliver Ray, Jaremy Ryan Ray, Jonathan Sean Ray, Justin Michael Ray, Kerah Ray, Amelia Christine Sedgwick, Bathsheba Shalom Tucker, Karen Woolley. (Wolf, Courtney) Modified on 9/14/2020 to add receipt number.(js).
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Service by Publication by Melissa Conklin, Rholena Lian Johnson, Tyler Edward Johnson, Adriana Jones, Elizabeth Ann Langford, Issac Anson Langford, Serina Sharon Langford, Dayer LeBaron, Javier LeBaron, Laura LeBaron, Miguel LeBaron, Ruthila LeBaron, William LeBaron, Adrian LeBaron-Soto, Howard J. Miller, Amber Ray, James Oliver Ray, Jaremy Ryan Ray, Jonathan Sean Ray, Justin Michael Ray, Kerah Ray, Amelia Christine Sedgwick, Bathsheba Shalom Tucker, Karen Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Nelson Tucker, #2 Exhibit Proposed Legal Notice)(Elsner, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John M. Eubanks. (ajs)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney John M. Eubanks (Filing fee $150, receipt number BNDDC-2010559) by Melissa Conklin, Rholena Lian Johnson, Tyler Edward Johnson, Adriana Jones, Elizabeth Ann Langford, Issac Anson Langford, Serina Sharon Langford, Dayer LeBaron, Javier LeBaron, Laura LeBaron, Miguel LeBaron, Ruthila LeBaron, William LeBaron, Adrian LeBaron-Soto, Howard J. Miller, Amber Ray, James Oliver Ray, Jaremy Ryan Ray, Jonathan Sean Ray, Justin Michael Ray, Kerah Ray, Amelia Christine Sedgwick, Bathsheba Shalom Tucker, Karen Woolley. (Eubanks, John) Modified to add receipt number on 8/20/2020 (ajs).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Elsner. (ajs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael E. Elsner (Filing fee $150, receipt number BNDDC-2009625) by Elizabeth Ann Langford, Issac Anson Langford, Serina Sharon Langford, Dayer LeBaron, Javier LeBaron, Laura LeBaron, Miguel LeBaron, Ruthila LeBaron, William LeBaron, Adrian LeBaron-Soto, Howard J. Miller, Amber Ray, James Oliver Ray, Jaremy Ryan Ray, Jonathan Sean Ray, Justin Michael Ray, Kerah Ray, Amelia Christine Sedgwick, Bathsheba Shalom Tucker, Karen Woolley. (Elsner, Michael) Modified to add receipt number on 8/19/2020 (ajs).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Mitchell. (js)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven Mitchell (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2008707) by Melissa Conklin, Rholena Lian Johnson, Tyler Edward Johnson, Adriana Jones, Elizabeth Ann Langford, Issac Anson Langford, Serina Sharon Langford, Dayer LeBaron, Javier LeBaron, Laura LeBaron, Miguel LeBaron, Ruthila LeBaron, William LeBaron, Adrian LeBaron-Soto, Howard J. Miller, Amber Ray, James Oliver Ray, Jaremy Ryan Ray, Jonathan Sean Ray, Justin Michael Ray, Kerah Ray, Amelia Christine Sedgwick, Bathsheba Shalom Tucker, Karen Woolley. (Mitchell, Steven) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/18/2020 with non-fillable pdf) (js).
August 18, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerks Office replaced document with non-fillable pdf; #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk's Office replaced document with non-fillable pdf. (js)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samuel Mitchell. (js)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Samuel Mitchell (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2007825) by Melissa Conklin, Rholena Lian Johnson, Tyler Edward Johnson, Adriana Jones, Elizabeth Ann Langford, Issac Anson Langford, Serina Sharon Langford, Dayer LeBaron, Javier LeBaron, Laura LeBaron, Miguel LeBaron, Ruthila LeBaron, William LeBaron, Adrian LeBaron-Soto, Howard J. Miller, Amber Ray, James Oliver Ray, Jaremy Ryan Ray, Jonathan Sean Ray, Justin Michael Ray, Kerah Ray, Amelia Christine Sedgwick, Bathsheba Shalom Tucker, Karen Woolley. (Mitchell, Samuel) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/17/2020 with non-fillable pdf - NEF Regenerated) (js).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Juarez Cartel. (rh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juarez Cartel (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000372) filed by Tyler Edward Johnson, Laura LeBaron, Dayer LeBaron, Howard J. Miller, Melissa Conklin, Elizabeth Ann Langford, Adrian LeBaron-Soto, Ruthila LeBaron, Issac Anson Langford, Serina Sharon Langford, Adriana Jones, Jonathan Sean Ray, Javier LeBaron, Miguel LeBaron, Kerah Ray, Amelia Christine Sedgwick, Rholena Lian Johnson, William LeBaron, Justin Michael Ray, Jaremy Ryan Ray, Amber Ray, Bathsheba Shalom Tucker, James Oliver Ray, Karen Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Juarez Cartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juarez Cartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Linea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicente Carrillo Fuentes Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Oliver Ray
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac Anson Langford
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Christine Sedgwick
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William LeBaron
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura LeBaron
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayer LeBaron
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel LeBaron
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Jones
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard J. Miller
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerah Ray
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier LeBaron
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Sean Ray
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Ray
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Langford
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaremy Ryan Ray
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Michael Ray
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Edward Johnson
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serina Sharon Langford
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rholena Lian Johnson
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Conklin
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthila LeBaron
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bathsheba Shalom Tucker
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Corina LeBaron
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian LeBaron-Soto
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Woolley
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Mitchell
Represented By: Steven Mitchell
Represented By: John Michael Eubanks
Represented By: Courtney Wolf
Represented By: Michael Edward Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?