Nelson et al v. Equinor Energy LP
Plaintiff: Deborah Nelson and Josolyn Nelson
Defendant: Equinor Energy LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00133
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as the presiding judge. (cjs)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Equinor Energy LP. (cjs)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 9/29/2020 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (BG)
August 28, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Corrected motion relief from Extension to File Response/Reply to Extension to File Answer. (rm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equinor Energy LP. (Huckfeldt, Christina) Modified on 8/28/2020 to correct motion relief. (rm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Equinor Energy LP. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/11/2020. (cjs)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall have until 9/08/2020 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equinor Energy LP. (Huckfeldt, Christina) Modified on 9/4/2020 to correct Motion relief from Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (rh)
August 21, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Corrected motion relief from Extension to File Response/Reply to Extension to File Answer. (rm)
August 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Equinor Energy LP answer due 9/8/2020. (cjs)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall have until September 8, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (JS) Modified on 8/21/2020 to clarify motion relief granted in text. NEF regenerated. (rm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equinor Energy LP. (Huckfeldt, Christina) Modified on 8/21/2020 to correct motion relief. (rm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Deborah Nelson, Josolyn Nelson. (am)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Deborah Nelson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/10/2020. (am)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Josolyn Nelson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/10/2020. (am)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equinor Energy LP. (am)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equinor Energy LP (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000919) filed by Josolyn Nelson, Deborah Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Equinor Energy LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Nelson
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josolyn Nelson
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinor Energy LP
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?