Morales v. North Dakota, State of
Petitioner: Bradley J. Morales
Respondent: North Dakota, State of
Case Number: 1:2020cv00137
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(cjs) Distributed on 8/14/2020 (cjs).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER deeming #2 MOTION for Transcripts moot and dismissing #4 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 8/14/2020 (cjs).
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Bradley J. Morales. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (BG) Distributed on 8/3/2020. (rh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bradley J. Morales. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/14/2020. (rh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Bradley J. Morales. (rh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bradley J. Morales re #2 MOTION for Transcripts, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Transcripts by Bradley J. Morales. (rh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley J. Morales. (Attachments: #1 Inmate History Report)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. North Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bradley J. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: North Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?