Double Diamond C Mineral, LLC v. Zavanna, LLC
Plaintiff: Double Diamond C Mineral, LLC
Defendant: Zavanna, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00140
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Zavanna, LLC. (Solomon, Deva)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Double Diamond C Mineral, LLC. (Barton, George)
September 23, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's office corrected name of corporate parent and regenerated NEF. (rh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zavanna, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zavanna Holdings, LLC for Zavanna, LLC. (Solomon, Deva) Modified on 9/23/2020 to correct name of corporate parent. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Zavanna, LLC. (Solomon, Deva)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Zavanna, LLC. (Solomon, Deva)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 9/21/2020 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (BG)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Other Response re #1 Complaint by Zavanna, LLC. (Solomon, Deva)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Deva Solomon on behalf of Zavanna, LLC (Solomon, Deva)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Zavanna, LLC. (rh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zavanna, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000935) filed by Double Diamond C Mineral, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Double Diamond C Mineral, LLC v. Zavanna, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double Diamond C Mineral, LLC
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zavanna, LLC
Represented By: Deva Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?