Mirada Energy, LLC et al v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Brisbane Properties LLC and Mirada Energy, LLC
Defendant: Europac Energy II LLC, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Europac Energy III LLC and Europac Energy LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00154
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Connor L. Cantrell. (ajs)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Connor L. Cantrell (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2034393) by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Connor L. Cantrell, #2 Proposed Order on Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Connor L. Cantrell)(Cantrell, Connor) Modified to add receipt number on 9/28/2020 (ajs).
September 24, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed in Error. Clerk's Office Restricted Access to Document. (ajs)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Connor L. Cantrell (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2032703) by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Connor L. Cantrell, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order on Motion Requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Connor L. Cantrell)(Hustead, Patrick) Modified on 9/24/2020 restrict access (ajs). Modified on 9/24/2020 (ajs).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(rh)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (rh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/15/2020. (cjs)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Brisbane Properties LLC, Mirada Energy, LLC. (cjs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/1/2020. (cjs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Brisbane Properties LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/1/2020. (cjs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mirada Energy, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/1/2020. (cjs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland from McKenzie County District Court, case number 27-2020-CV-276. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000978 filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Summons, #4 Exhibit C-Admission of Service, #5 Exhibit D-Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland Answer)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirada Energy, LLC et al v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Europac Energy II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Patrick Q. Hustead
Represented By: Connor L. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Europac Energy III LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Europac Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brisbane Properties LLC
Represented By: Ariston Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirada Energy, LLC
Represented By: Ariston Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?