Crawford v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Amanda Mae Crawford
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00170
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (mf)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Amanda Mae Crawford. (cjs)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Commissioner of Social Security. (mf)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wall, Sarah)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mf)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee IFP) filed by Amanda Mae Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Amanda Mae Crawford. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/5/2020. (rh)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward A. Wicklund. (js)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward A. Wicklund (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2028417) by Amanda Mae Crawford. (Wicklund, Edward) Modified on 9/17/2020 to add receipt number. (js)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amanda Mae Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Appeals Council Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Mae Crawford
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?