Cross et al v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Hudson and Raymond Cross
Defendant: Judy Brugh, Mark Fox, Mervin Packineau, Monica Mayer, Cory Spotted Bear, Fred Fox and Randy Phelan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00177
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-3424 for #25 Notice of Appeal. (mf)
November 19, 2020 Filing 26 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #25 Notice of Appeal, (cjs)
November 19, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #24 Clerk's Judgment, #23 Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Raymond Cross, Marilyn Hudson. Filing fee $505, Receipt #ANDDC-2069585. (King, Lawrence) Modified on 11/19/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).
October 28, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Cory Spotted Bear, Fred Fox, Judy Brugh, Mark Fox, Mervin Packineau, Monica Mayer, Randy Phelan against Marilyn Hudson, Raymond Cross. The matter is dismissed without prejudice.(rh)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor denying as moot #5 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; denying as moot #8 Motion Requesting Oral Argument ; denying as moot 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (KC)
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 E-Filing Modification Request re #21 MEMORANDUM in Support (rh)
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Judy Brugh, Fred Fox, Mark Fox, Monica Mayer, Mervin Packineau, Randy Phelan, Cory Spotted Bear. (Attachments: #1 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* Exhibit MHA Nation Constitution and Bylaws)(Breuer, Peter) Modified on 10/27/2020 to restrict access to attachment. (rh)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Judy Brugh, Fred Fox, Mark Fox, Monica Mayer, Mervin Packineau, Randy Phelan, Cory Spotted Bear. (Breuer, Peter)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding Judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(jb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Raymond Cross, Marilyn Hudson. (jb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 17 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marilyn Hudson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/26/2020. (mf)
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Raymond Cross. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/26/2020. (mf)
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Hudson, Raymond Cross. Randy Phelan served on 10/11/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (King, Lawrence)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Hudson, Raymond Cross. Monica Mayer served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020 (King, Lawrence)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Hudson, Raymond Cross. Mervin Packineau served on 10/3/2020, answer due 10/26/2020 (King, Lawrence)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Hudson, Raymond Cross. Cory Spotted Bear served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020 (King, Lawrence)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Hudson, Raymond Cross. Mark Fox served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020 (King, Lawrence)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Hudson, Raymond Cross. Fred Fox served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020 (King, Lawrence)
September 30, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerks Office filed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction at 9 . (js)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Raymond Cross, Marilyn Hudson. See Document filed at #5 . (js)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Requesting Oral Argument by Raymond Cross, Marilyn Hudson. (King, Lawrence)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence E. King re #6 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Raymond Cross, Marilyn Hudson. (King, Lawrence)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Raymond Cross, Marilyn Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Election Board Rejection Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Eligible TAT Voters, #3 Exhibit C - Time, Travel Costs, #4 Exhibit D - NDSU Fiscal Analysis)(King, Lawrence) Modified on 9/30/2020 to add link. (js)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief by Raymond Cross, Marilyn Hudson. (King, Lawrence)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Judy Brugh, Fred Fox, Mark Fox, Monica Mayer, Mervin Packineau, Randy Phelan, Cory Spotted Bear. (mf)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marilyn Hudson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/13/2020. (mf)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Raymond Cross. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/13/2020. (mf)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Judy Brugh, Fred Fox, Mark Fox, Monica Mayer, Mervin Packineau, Randy Phelan, Cory Spotted Bear (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120001102) filed by Marilyn Hudson, Raymond Cross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Election Board Rejection Letter, #3 Exhibit B- MHA Supreme Court Order, #4 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Raymond Cross (Unsigned), #5 Exhibit D- Asst Sec. Of Interior D'Ewart Letter, #6 Exhibit E- Price 4.27.20 Letter to Fox, #7 Exhibit F-TAT Corporate Charter, #8 Exhibit G- 2020 TAT Election Notice, #9 Exhibit H- Cross's COVID-19 Test Result, #10 Affidavit of Lawrence King)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross et al v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Brugh
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fox
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mervin Packineau
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Mayer
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Spotted Bear
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Fox
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Phelan
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Hudson
Represented By: Lawrence E. King
Represented By: Dennis Pathroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Cross
Represented By: Lawrence E. King
Represented By: Dennis Pathroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?