United States of America v. Komrosky et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James W. Komrosky, Deborah Lynne Komrosky, Estate of Deborah Lynne Komrosky, First Western Bank & Trust and All Persons Unknown
Case Number: 1:2020cv00204
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. First Western Bank & Trust served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021 (Iversen, Tara)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration for Service by Publication by United States of America. (Iversen, Tara)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Estate of Deborah Lynne Komrosky served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020; Deborah Lynne Komrosky served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020; James W. Komrosky served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020 (Iversen, Tara)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Persons Unknown, Estate of Deborah Lynne Komrosky, First Western Bank & Trust, Deborah Lynne Komrosky, James W. Komrosky. (cjs)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Persons Unknown, Estate of Deborah Lynne Komrosky, First Western Bank & Trust, Deborah Lynne Komrosky, James W. Komrosky (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Note, #2 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Certificate of Indebtedness, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Intention to Foreclose, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Komrosky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Komrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Lynne Komrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Deborah Lynne Komrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Western Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tara V. Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?