Baker v. CSE ICON, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Baker
Defendant: CSE ICON, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00040
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stewart Hoffer. (cjs)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stewart Hoffer (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2146037) by CSE ICON, Inc.. (Hoffer, Stewart) Modified on 3/24/2021 to add receipt number (cjs).
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Baker. CSE ICON, Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021 (Jones, Taneska)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSE ICON, Inc. (jb)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSE ICON, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000412) filed by Steven Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Form for Wage Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. CSE ICON, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Baker
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: Taneska Jones
Represented By: Ricardo J. Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSE ICON, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?