Baker v. Bruin E&P Operating, LLC
Plaintiff: Steven Baker
Defendant: Bruin E&P Operating, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00041
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Painter on behalf of Bruin E&P Operating, LLC (Painter, Brett)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathalie Bleuze on behalf of Bruin E&P Operating, LLC (Bleuze, Nathalie)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven Baker. Bruin E&P Operating, LLC waiver sent on 3/2/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Jones, Taneska) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/5/2021 as a non-fillable PDF). NEF regenerated. (sj).
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bruin E&P Operating, LLC. (jb)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruin E&P Operating, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000412) filed by Steven Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Form for Wage Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Bruin E&P Operating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruin E&P Operating, LLC
Represented By: Brett Painter
Represented By: Nathalie Bleuze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Baker
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: Taneska Jones
Represented By: Ricardo J. Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?