Lane v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jamie Rene Lane
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00045
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration answer due 6/29/2021. (mf)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 6/29/2021 to file the certified administrative record and response to plaintiff's complaint. (BG) Distributed on 4/29/2021. (jb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint,, by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis)(Burkland, Melissa)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (mf)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Wall, Sarah)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the United States Attorney for the District of North Dakota, the United States Attorney General, and the Social Security Administration were served on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (mf)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee IFP) filed by Jamie Rene Lane. (Attachments: #1 Order of Appeals Council, #2 Complaint Letter, #3 SSA Decision, #4 Disability Letter from Randy Shoemaker, #5 Functional Capacity Evaluation, #6 MRI Report, #7 CHI St. Alexius Medical Report, #8 CHI St. Alexius Diagnostic Imaging Report, #9 CHI St. Alexius Diagnostic Imaging Report, #10 CHI Diagnostic Imaging Report, #11 CHI St. Alexius Neurology Lab Report, #12 Chiari Severity Index Article, #13 Chiari Malforation Article, #14 Exhibit and Witness List, #15 CHI St. Alexius Diagnostic Imaging Report, #16 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (BG) Distributed on 3/3/2021 (cjs).
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jamie Rene Lane. (mf)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jamie Rene Lane. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/16/2021. (mf)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie Rene Lane. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Order of Appeals Council, #3 Complaint Letter, #4 SSA Office of Hearing Operations, #5 Email from Randy Shoemaker, #6 Elite Health and Fitness, #7 Report, #8 Medical Records, #9 Medical Records, #10 Medical Records, #11 Medical Records, #12 Medical Records, #13 Medical Records, #14 Research Article, #15 Research Article, #16 Exhibit and Witness List, #17 Mailing Envelope)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Rene Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?