Central Specialties, Inc. v. Mountrail County, North Dakota
Plaintiff: Central Specialties, Inc.
Defendant: Mountrail County, North Dakota
Case Number: 1:2021cv00050
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 6/2/2021 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Scheduling Conference previously set for 4/28/2021) (BG)
April 26, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #18 Order, Set Hearings to Amend Order for Rule 26(F) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference, and Order re Resolution of Discovery Disputes by Mountrail County, North Dakota. (Schmidt, Brian)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (LJH)
April 1, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel L. Hovland: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2021 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central Specialties, Inc. (Court Reporter RC) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Slide 1 - ND Competitive Bidding Law, #2 Plaintiff's Slide 2 - Current and Old Bidding Statutes, #3 Plaintiff's Slide 3 - Page 16 of Document 14 in this case, #4 Plaintiff's Slide 4 - Document 5-3 in this case (Awards), #5 Plaintiff's Slide 5 - Letter from McKenzie County Public Works dated 3/3/21 re: Plaintiff's projects, #6 Plaintiff's Slide 6 - Page 1 of Document 1-2 in this case (letter to Jana from John Sauber), #7 Plaintiff's Slide 7 - Transcript of Mountrail Co. Commissioners' Meeting held on 3/2/21, #8 Plaintiff's Slide 8 - Page 1 of Document 1-4 in this case (Letter to John Sauber from Gratech Company dated 2/22/21), #9 Plaintiff's Slide 9 - Page 5 of Document 14 in this case, #10 Plaintiff's Slide 10 - Page 3 of Document 14-8 in this case (photo of blocked road)) (rm)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mountrail County, North Dakota.(Schmidt, Brian)
March 25, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Allan Minnerath re #15 Reply to Response to Motion by Central Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 - transcript of the Mountrail County Commissioners Meeting of March 2, 2021, #2 Exhibit 9 - Jan. 10, 2018 Brosz Engineering Inspection Letter, #3 Exhibit 10 - July 21, 2020, Certificate of Substantial Completion)(Sellers, Nathan)
March 25, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central Specialties, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Jana Hennessy re #13 Response to Motion by Mountrail County, North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HB 1358 Funding Reimbursement Request, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Interstate Engineering, Inc, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to the ND DOT, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email received from the NDDOT, #5 Exhibit 5 - Release of All Claims, #6 Exhibit 6 - Closing letter the County, #7 Exhibit 7- Email outlining the problems, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email to CSI and photos, #9 Exhibit 9 - Email and photos, #10 Exhibit 10 - County Commission Meeting Minutes, #11 Exhibit 11- Email and attachment, #12 Exhibit 12 - November 15, 2016 letter, #13 Exhibit 13 - November 17, 2016 email, #14 Exhibit 14 - November 21, 2016 Email and CSI's November 23, 2016, Response, #15 Exhibit 15 - Notice of Claim, #16 Exhibit 16 - Notice of Defective Work, #17 Exhibit 17 - Brosz Engineering letter sent to CSI, #18 Exhibit 18 - CSI' s January 18, 20 l 7 emaiI, #19 Exhibit 19 - Brosz's February 2, 2017 letter to CSI, #20 Exhibit 20 - Brosz's August 23, 2016 email and photos, #21 Exhibit 21 - December 12, 2016 letter, #22 Exhibit 22 - Brosz's September 22, 2017 email, #23 Exhibit 23 - Correspondence, #24 Exhibit 24 - Invoice and incident)(Schmidt, Brian)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mountrail County, North Dakota. (Schmidt, Brian)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #7 Motion to Expedite; granting 9 Motion for Hearing( Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2021 at 01:30 PM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland.) (LJH)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central Specialties, Inc.. Mountrail County, North Dakota served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021 (Sellers, Nathan)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central Specialties, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Expedite Oral Argument (Sellers, Nathan)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Schmidt on behalf of Mountrail County, North Dakota (Schmidt, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Central Specialties, Inc. See document #7 . (cjs)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Oral Argument by Central Specialties, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Specialties, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Allen Minnerath re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Central Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Road Construction Work Awarded by NDDOT #2 Exhibit 2 - CSI Total Revenue #3 Exhibit 3 - Awards CSI Received #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter from McKenzie County Public Works #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from CSI's Bonding Agent #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter from CSI's Bank Evidening CSI Grate A+++ Credit Risk #7 Exhibit 7 - Listing of Projects)(Sellers, Nathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central Specialties, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Central Specialties, Inc.. (Sellers, Nathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mountrail County, North Dakota. (cjs)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mountrail County, North Dakota (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000434) filed by Central Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Project Provisions, #2 Exhibit 2-Bid Tabulations, #3 Exhibit 3-Agenda, #4 Exhibit 4-Letter dated February 22, 2021, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Specialties, Inc. v. Mountrail County, North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountrail County, North Dakota
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Represented By: Brian D. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan R. Sellers
Represented By: Kyle E. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?