Shrock et al v. National Oilwell Varco, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Shrock and Shelle Noel Harrelson
Defendant: Avery Enterprizes, Inc., Continental Resources, Inc. and National Oilwell Varco, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00053
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Adams on behalf of Continental Resources, Inc. (Adams, Steven)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Continental Resources, Inc..(Pittman, Ryan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A. Pittman on behalf of Continental Resources, Inc. (Pittman, Ryan)
April 5, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 NOTICE of Appearance. Document filed in error. Attorney Ryan Pittman has not filed a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case, nor has he applied for full admissions for the Federal District Court - District of North Dakota. Clerks office restricted access to document; #6 ANSWER. Document filed in error. Attorney Ryan Pittman has not filed a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case, nor has he applied for full admissions for the Federal District Court - District of North Dakota. Clerks office restricted access to document. (js)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Continental Resources, Inc. (Pittman, Ryan) Modified on 4/5/2021 to restrict access. (js)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A. Pittman on behalf of Continental Resources, Inc. (Pittman, Ryan) Modified on 4/5/2021 to restrict access. (js)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by National Oilwell Varco, L.P..(Hughes, John)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of National Oilwell Varco, L.P. (Hughes, John)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Avery Enterprizes, Inc., Continental Resources, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, L.P.. (jb)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avery Enterprizes, Inc., Continental Resources, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, L.P. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000447) filed by Courtney Shrock, Shelle Noel Harrelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shrock et al v. National Oilwell Varco, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Enterprizes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Adams
Represented By: Ryan A. Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco, L.P.
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Shrock
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Represented By: Michael R. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelle Noel Harrelson
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Represented By: Michael R. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?