Cargill, Incorporated v. Dewitz Feedlot Inc.
Plaintiff: Cargill, Incorporated
Defendant: Dewitz Feedlot Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00064
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #15 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference REset for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. To participate, the parties should use the call in information previously provided. (Conference previously set for 6/04/2021) (BG)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue by Dewitz Feedlot Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whitticar, Michael) Modified on 5/12/2021 to remove "exhibit" language (cjs).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
May 3, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Dewitz Feedlot Inc..(Whitticar, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 5/3/2021 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (BG)
April 20, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Clerk's Office removed unnecessary 'exhibit' reference in docket text. (pb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Complaint, by Dewitz Feedlot Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order)(Whitticar, Michael) Modified to remove unnecessary 'exhibit' reference in docket text on 4/20/2021 (pb).
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargill, Incorporated. Dewitz Feedlot Inc. served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021 (Pelham, Zachary)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dewitz Feedlot Inc.. (jb)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against Dewitz Feedlot Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000481) filed by Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Agreement (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B - Invoice (Redacted))(jb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Modified on 3/26/2021 to add civil cover sheet. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT Complaint by Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit B, Invoice)(Pelham, Zachary)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel shall promptly file unredacted copies of the proposed documents under seal and redacted copies of the proposed documents for the public's access. Any objection to this Order by the Defendant shall be filed within 14 days of being served with the Complaint. (CK)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney X. Kevin Zhao. (sj)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amran A. Farah. (mf)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amran A. Farah (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC - 2146237) by Cargill, Incorporated. (Farah, Amran) Modified on 3/25/2021 to add receipt number (mf).
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney X. Kevin Zhao (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2146230) by Cargill, Incorporated. (Zhao, Xiaochuan) Modified on 3/25/2021 to add receipt number.(sj).
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Master Over-The-Counter Swaps Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Settlement Invoice, #4 Complaint (Redacted), #5 Exhibit A (Redacted), #6 Exhibit B (Redacted))(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargill, Incorporated v. Dewitz Feedlot Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewitz Feedlot Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Whitticar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargill, Incorporated
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Represented By: Amran A Farah
Represented By: Xiaochuan Kevin Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?