Caldwell v. Arlo G. Lott Trucking et al
Plaintiff: Bradford Caldwell
Defendant: Arlo G. Lott Trucking, Archer-Daniels-Midland Company and Colin Dale Kennedy
Case Number: 1:2021cv00107
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION Relief From Order Reversing Dismissal of ADM filed by Bradford Caldwell. (Larson, Mark)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (5 days) (BG)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 5/13/2022. Discovery Motions due by 5/13/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/4/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/31/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 4/29/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 6/15/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 9/24/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/24/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 9/24/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 10/21/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2022.(BG)
July 1, 2021 Filing 19 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/2021. (BG)
June 15, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION Relief From Order Reversing Dismissal of ADM filed by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Kreuder, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION Relief From Order Reversing Dismissal of ADM by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Kreuder, Christopher)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 15 replaced on 6/2/2021 to correct error in document) (cjs). Regenerated on 6/2/2021 (cjs).
June 1, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 ANSWER to Complaint. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) at #16 . (sj)
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Kreuder, Christopher)
May 27, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Arlo G. Lott Trucking, Colin Dale Kennedy. (sj)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Arlo G. Lott Trucking, Colin Dale Kennedy.(Stock, Robert) Modified on 6/1/2021 to restrict access. (sj).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arlo G. Lott Trucking. (Stock, Robert)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Arlo G. Lott Trucking, Colin Dale Kennedy. (cjs)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Kreuder, Christopher)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher A. Kreuder. (jb)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher A. Kreuder (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2183440) by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Kreuder, Christopher) Modified on 5/20/2021 to add receipt number. (jb)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Bradford Caldwell. (jb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Colin Dale Kennedy. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/26/2021. (mf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bradford Caldwell. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/26/2021. (mf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Arlo G. Lott Trucking. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/26/2021. (mf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/26/2021. (mf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company from Ward County District Court, case number 51-2020-cv-00707. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000629 filed by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Docket Indexes 1-44, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Docket Indexes 45-71, #4 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Arlo G. Lott Trucking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford Caldwell
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlo G. Lott Trucking
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Represented By: Christopher A Kreuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Dale Kennedy
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?