Cargill, Incorporated v. Jangula
Plaintiff: Cargill, Incorporated
Defendant: Troy William Jangula
Case Number: 1:2021cv00116
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor Adopting #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Cargill, Incorporated. This case is dismissed. (CK)
June 23, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (jb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cargill, Incorporated re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Pelham, Zachary)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cargill, Incorporated (Pelham, Zachary)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 * RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Cargill, Incorporated. (mf) Modified on 6/15/2021 to restrict access per filers request (mf).
June 15, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Consent/Reassignment Form. Error in document. Clerk's Office restricted access to document per request of filer. (mf)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cargill, Incorporated. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/21/2021. (mf)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Troy William Jangula. (cjs)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against Troy William Jangula (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000658) filed by Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT (Complaint) by Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Master Swaps Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Settlement Invoices)(cjs)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (BG)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cargill, Incorporated. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/9/2021. (cjs)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Cargill, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-Master Swaps Agreement, #3 Exhibit B-Settlement Invoices)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargill, Incorporated v. Jangula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy William Jangula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargill, Incorporated
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?