Swanson v. DeMello et al
Plaintiff: Chase Swanson
Defendant: Britta K. DeMello and Hon. James Gion
Case Number: 1:2021cv00130
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 JUDGMENT(cjs) Distributed with PLRA Appeal Packet on 8/9/2021 (cjs).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #10 Report and Recommendations. (MM) Distributed on 8/9/2021 (cjs).
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 OBJECTION by Chase Swanson to #10 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Complaint filed by Chase Swanson by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2021 (BG) Distributed on 7/12/2021 (mf).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (mf)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Chase Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Britta K. DeMello, James Gion filed by Chase Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to North Dakota State Penitentiary re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jb) Distributed on 6/23/2021. (jb)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/23/2021 to correct a typographical error.) Regenerated NEF and distributed on 6/23/2021. (jb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Chase Swanson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/6/2021. (cjs)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #3 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chase Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. DeMello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britta K. DeMello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. James Gion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?