Pineda v. Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stacy Pineda
Defendant: Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00135
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days) (BG)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 5/1/2022. Discovery Motions due by 6/1/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/1/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/1/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/1/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 4/1/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2022. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 4/1/2022. Nondispositive Motions due by 4/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2022.(BG)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 8/5/2021. (BG)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (mf)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc.. (mf)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/21/2021. (js)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc..(Quinton, Corey)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Stacy Pineda. (cjs)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Stacy Pineda. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/20/2021. (mf)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stacy Pineda. Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Dickson, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Stacy Pineda. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/1/2021. (jb)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc. (jb)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000712) filed by Stacy Pineda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pineda v. Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulder Hospitality Group, Inc.
Represented By: Corey J. Quinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Pineda
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?