JM Grain, Inc. v. TRC Trading Corporation
Plaintiff: JM Grain, Inc.
Defendant: TRC Trading Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00150
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 1/23/2023 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (2 days) (BG)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 5/2/2022. Discovery Motions due by 6/1/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/1/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 5/2/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 7/1/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 12/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 12/1/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2022.(BG)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 9/2/2021. (BG)
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION Scheduling/Discovery Plan by JM Grain, Inc.. (Stanley, Caren)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim 5 by JM Grain, Inc..(Stanley, Caren)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 9/2/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. To participate, the parties should use the call in instructions previously provided. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (Previously set for 8/11/2021) (BG)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JM Grain, Inc.. (Stanley, Caren)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRC Trading Corporation identifying Corporate Parent TRC Group, Inc. for TRC Trading Corporation, TRC Trading Corporation.. (Leistico, Gary)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(jb)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by TRC Trading Corporation. (jb)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (jb) Modified on 7/13/2021 to add Order. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against JM Grain, Inc. by TRC Trading Corporation. See document #1 , Attachment 4. (mf)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to JM Grain, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/23/2021. (mf)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to TRC Trading Corporation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/23/2021. (mf)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRC Trading Corporation from McLean County District Court, case number Unknown. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000790 filed by TRC Trading Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process, #4 Exhibit C - Defendant's Answer and Counterclaim, #5 Declaration of Gary R. Leistico, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JM Grain, Inc. v. TRC Trading Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM Grain, Inc.
Represented By: Caren W. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRC Trading Corporation
Represented By: Gary R. Leistico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?