Bohman v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Bohman
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00174
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (BG)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/1/2022 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (4 days). (LC)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Discovery Motions due by 10/6/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2022. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/15/2022. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/15/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 10/10/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 1/1/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2022. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/1/2022. Nondispositive Motions due by 10/16/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2022.(LC)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2021. (LC)
October 12, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 MOTION for Leave to File. Clerk's Office clarified attachment description. (pb)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Scheduling Discovery Plan by Thomas H. Bohman. (Hager, Scott)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Thomas H. Bohman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Hager, Scott) Modified to clarify attachment description on 10/12/2021 (pb).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell S. Ponessa. (pb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. for Stanley Black & Decker, Inc... (Pelham, Zachary)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Pelham, Zachary)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Russell S. Ponessa (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2258876) by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Ponessa, Russ) Modified to add receipt number on 9/10/2021 (pb).
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary E. Pelham on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Pelham, Zachary)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. from Ward County District Court, case number 51-2021-CV-01463. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000961. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohman v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Bohman
Represented By: Scott Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Russ Ponessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?