McGinnis v. Slayer
Petitioner: Neil Adams McGinnis
Respondent: Wardon Slayer
Case Number: 1:2021cv00191
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter denying #19 Motion for Reconsideration (BG) Distributed on 11/30/2021. (jb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order by Neil Adams McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT to document: #3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Neil Adams McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (mf) Distributed on 11/3/2021 (mf)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of dismissal without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet) (BG) Distributed on 11/3/2021 (mf)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to document: #3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Neil Adams McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Neil McGinnis (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (mf)
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Neil McGinnis (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (mf)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to document: #11 Consent/Reassignment Form by Neil Adams McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(mf)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Neil Adams McGinnis. (mf)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to document: #3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Neil Adams McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel (LC) Distributed on 10/20/2021 (cjs).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (LC) Distributed on 10/20/2021 (cjs).
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Neil Adams McGinnis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/2/2021. (jb) Distributed on 10/19/2021. (jb)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Release from Custody by Neil Adams McGinnis. (jb)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Neil Adams McGinnis. (jb)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to document: #3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Neil Adams McGinnis. (jb)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Neil Adams McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope, #3 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Neil Adams McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account)(jb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 Remark: HABEAS PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete Habeas packet sent to inmate. (jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGinnis v. Slayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Neil Adams McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wardon Slayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?