Hunter v. State of North Dakota
Petitioner: Ashley Kenneth Hunter
Respondent: State of North Dakota and Warden James Sayler
Case Number: 1:2021cv00197
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Sayler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Register of Actions, State v. Hunter, Cass County District Court Case No. 09-2015-CR-2085, #2 Exhibit 2. Criminal Judgment, State v. Hunter, Cass County District Court Case No. 09-2015-CR-2085, #3 Exhibit 3. North Dakota Supreme Court Docket 20170345, #4 Exhibit 4. State v. Hunter. 2018 ND 173, 914 N.W.2d 527, #5 Exhibit United States Supreme Court Docket No. 18-6323, Hunter v. North Dakota, #6 Exhibit 6. Register of Actions, Hunter v. State, Cass County District Court Case No. 09-2019-CV-2260, #7 Exhibit 7. North Dakota Supreme Court Docket, 20200160, #8 Exhibit 8. Hunter v. State, 2020 ND 224, 949 N.W.2d 841)(Mahoney, Michael)
December 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by James Sayler. (Mahoney, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ashley Kenneth Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel Aaron Gereszek terminated. (BG) Distributed on 12/8/2021 (mf)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Ashley Hunter by Ashley Kenneth Hunter. (Gereszek, Samuel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Ashley Kenneth Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER identifying the operative petition, directing that it be filed, substituting the named respondent, amending the case caption, ordering respondent to answer, and instructing Petitioner's counsel to clarify his role/status by 12/20/2021. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG) Distributed on 12/6/2021 (mf).
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED PETITION to document: #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Ashley Kenneth Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Petitioner shall have until 12/13/2021 to file an amended petition. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Ashley Hunter (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jb)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Ashley Hunter (Attachments: #1 Resident Requests and Article, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ashley Kenneth Hunter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/22/2021. (jb)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Ashley Hunter (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (mf)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to document: #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Ashley Kenneth Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ashley Kenneth Hunter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/8/2021. (js)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Ashley Kenneth Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Facts, #2 Appendix - Table of Contents, #3 1a - Corrected Opinion of the ND Supreme Court filed 9/6/2018, #4 19a - Opinion & Order Denying Motion to Suppress Statements, #5 44a - Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #6 45a - Affidavit of Detective Ysteboe, #7 47a - Crime Scene Roster, #8 49a - Partial Deposition Transcript of 4/26/17 Motion Hearing, #9 65a - Partial Deposition Transcript of 5/24/17 Jury Trial, #10 Sullivan Memo, #11 Order Denying Application for Post-Conviction Relief, #12 10/21/20 - ND Supreme Court Opinion)(js)
October 25, 2021 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 322000031 (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. State of North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ashley Kenneth Hunter
Represented By: Samuel Aaron Gereszek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden James Sayler
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?