Regalado v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mikayla Denise Regalado
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00003
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Plaintiff's motion due by 5/16/2022. Defendant's motion due bye 6/17/2022. Plaintiff's reply due by 7/1/2022. (BG)
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 Administrative Record by Social Security Administration re #9 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing Part 1, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing Part 2, #4 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1, #6 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2, #7 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 3, #8 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 4, #9 Non Disability Related Development, #10 Disability Related Development Part 1, #11 Disability Related Development Part 2, #12 Medical Records Part 1, #13 Medical Records Part 2, #14 Medical Records Part 3, #15 Medical Records Part 4, #16 Medical Records Part 5, #17 Medical Records Part 6, #18 Medical Records Part 7, #19 Medical Records Part 8, #20 Medical Records Part 9, #21 Medical Records Part 10, #22 Medical Records Part 11, #23 Medical Records Part 12, #24 Medical Records Part 13, #25 Medical Records Part 14)(Wall, Sarah)
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Wall, Sarah)
January 27, 2022 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. (Answer due as to SSA terminated). (pb)
January 27, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Clerk's Office removed interested party SSA from docket text and terminated its Answer deadline. (pb)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as Social Security Administration served on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Beall, Ashley) Modified to remove interested party SSA on 1/27/2022 (pb).
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Mikayla Denise Regalado. (mf)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mikayla Denise Regalado. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/31/2022. (mf)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (rh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Wall, Sarah)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mikayla Denise Regalado. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/19/2022. (cjs)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $402, receipt number 122000265) filed by Mikayla Denise Regalado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regalado v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikayla Denise Regalado
Represented By: Ashley Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?