United States of America v. Bethel et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Barbara J. Bethel, Karl J. Bethel and All persons unknown, claiming any estate or interest in, or lien or encumbrance upon, the real estate described in the Complaint
Case Number: 1:2022cv00078
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration for Service by Publication re #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued by United States of America. (Burkland, Melissa)
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed Karl J. Bethel served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022 (rh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All persons unknown, claiming any estate or interest in, or lien or encumbrance upon, the real estate described in the Complaint, Barbara J. Bethel, Barbara J. Bethel(deceased), Karl J. Bethel. (cjs)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All persons unknown, claiming any estate or interest in, or lien or encumbrance upon, the real estate described in the Complaint, Barbara J. Bethel, Barbara J. Bethel(deceased), Karl J. Bethel (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Modification of Note, #4 Exhibit D-Statement of Additional Advance, #5 Exhibit E-Certified Statement of Account, #6 Exhibit F-Notice)(cjs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2022: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjs). Modified on 5/6/2022 to add civil cover sheet. Regenerated NEF (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bethel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J. Bethel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl J. Bethel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All persons unknown, claiming any estate or interest in, or lien or encumbrance upon, the real estate described in the Complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?