Penman v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Plaintiff: Ronald Penman and Adelante Oil & Gas, LLC
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00097
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Penman Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Adalante Lease)(Forster, Paul)
August 4, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #4 Stipulation filed by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Defendant shall have until 8/4/2022 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint.(LC)
June 30, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC answer due 8/4/2022. (mf)
June 29, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Penman, Adelante Oil & Gas, LLC. (Swanson, Joshua)
June 29, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #3 Amended Complaint by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
June 22, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC filed by Ronald Penman, Adelante Oil & Gas, LLC.(jb)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC. (mf)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000080) filed by Ronald Penman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penman v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Penman
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Stacy Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelante Oil & Gas, LLC
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Stacy Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Daniel T. Donovan
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?