Gonzalez v. North Dakota, State of
Petitioner: Garron Gonzalez
Respondent: North Dakota, State of
Case Number: 1:2023cv00104
Filed: May 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Amended Petition due August 31, 2023. (SG) Distributed on 7/17/2023. (jb)
July 17, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2023. (jb)
June 12, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Garron Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
May 30, 2023 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to document: #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Garron Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 1 - Miscellaneous Motions and Orders, #2 2 - Application for Post conviction Relief Pursuant to NDCC 29-32.1 dated 2/20/2018, #3 3 - 08-2018-cv-604 State Pleadings, #4 4 - Appellant's Brief dated 7/23/2018, #5 5 - Supreme Court Pleading, #6 6 - Transcripts Hearing held 1/14/2020, #7 7 - Post Hearing Brief 1/23/2020 (08-2018-cv-604), #8 8 - Findings and Order 2/26/2020, #9 9 - Supreme Court Pleading dated 6/22/2020, #10 10 - Supreme court Pleading 10/21/2020, #11 11 - Brief In Support of Motion dated 7/23/2021 (08-2018-cv-604), #12 12 - Findings and Order dated 8/20/2021 (08-2018-cv-604), #13 13 - Supreme Court Pleadings dated 3/23/2022, #14 14 - Supreme Court Pleading dated 5/26/2022, #15 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
May 24, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Garron Gonzalez. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/7/2023. (mf)
May 24, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Garron Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
May 24, 2023 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 100001129 (mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. North Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Garron Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: North Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?