Yantzer v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Yantzer
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00110
Filed: June 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER Re: Settlement. The parties have reached a settlement. Closing documents due within 30 days of the date of this order by Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(JO)
June 2, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03240. Transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Northern District of North Dakota. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/12/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 15836) (sa)
May 24, 2023 Filing 6 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Case Specific) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3)(Hegarty, Mark)
May 22, 2023 Filing 5 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (General) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71, #72 72, #73 73, #74 74, #75 75, #76 76, #77 77, #78 78, #79 79, #80 80, #81 81, #82 82, #83 83, #84 84, #85 85, #86 86, #87 87, #88 88, #89 89, #90 90, #91 91, #92 92, #93 93, #94 94, #95 95, #96 96, #97 97, #98 98, #99 99, #100 100, #101 101, #102 102, #103 103, #104 104, #105 105, #106 106, #107 107, #108 108, #109 109, #110 110, #111 111, #112 112, #113 113, #114 114, #115 115, #116 116)(Britton, Mary)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ss)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8617850) filed by Carmen Yantzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Curtis Brooks Cutter added to party Carmen Yantzer(pty:pla).(Cutter, Curtis) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (ss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yantzer v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Yantzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?