Bray v. Ninneman et al
Plaintiff: John Bray
Defendant: Colene Ninneman doing business as Impact Fireworks, STL, Inc. doing business as Generous Jerry's Fireworks and Charles Ninneman doing business as Impact Fireworks
Case Number: 1:2024cv00221
Filed: November 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Charles Ninneman, Colene Ninneman.(Brooke, John)
December 18, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by John Bray.(Larson, Mark)
December 12, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Bray. Colene Ninneman served on 12/9/2024, answer due 12/30/2024 (Larson, Mark)
December 12, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Bray. Charles Ninneman served on 12/9/2024, answer due 12/30/2024 (Larson, Mark)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE TO FILE DEFENDANT CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS by Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Amended Complaint due by 12/18/24. (SB)
December 5, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 12/18/2024. (cjs)
December 4, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Bray. STL, Inc. served on 11/15/2024, answer due 12/6/2024 (Larson, Mark)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John H. Brooke. (cjs)
November 18, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney John H. Brooke (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-3024778 ) by Charles Ninneman, Colene Ninneman. (Brooke, John) Modified on 11/18/2024 to add receipt number (cjs).
November 15, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Beehler on behalf of Charles Ninneman, Colene Ninneman (Beehler, Bradley)
November 4, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles Ninneman, Colene Ninneman, STL, Inc. (jb)
November 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Ninneman, Colene Ninneman, STL, Inc. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100002683) filed by John Bray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray v. Ninneman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colene Ninneman doing business as Impact Fireworks
Represented By: John H Brooke
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STL, Inc. doing business as Generous Jerry's Fireworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ninneman doing business as Impact Fireworks
Represented By: John H Brooke
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bray
Represented By: Anders Larson
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?