Mid-Continent Casualty Company v. MoLo Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Defendant: MoLo Solutions, LLC and ArcBest Corporation
Case Number: 1:2025cv00020
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/25/2025 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Deadlines. Two business days prior to the Final Pretrial Conference, counsel must email the Exhibit List and Witness List for each party and Expert Reports to: ndd_J-Hochhalter@ndd.uscourts.gov. Trial Memorandum due at least 7 days prior to trial. Deposition designations due at least 14 days prior to trial. Additional deposition designations by opposing parties due 7 days prior to trial. Objections to deposition designations due 4 days prior to trial. Jury Instructions due at least 7 days prior to trial. Motions in limine due 30 days prior to trial. Additional deadlines and details contained in the Order. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2026 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
March 20, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 10/5/2026 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days) (BG)
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 7/25/2025. Discovery Motions due by 8/29/2025. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/31/2025. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/28/2025. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/26/2025. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 2/27/2026. Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2026. Motions to consolidate or bifurcate due by 8/29/2025. Depositions of non-expert witnesses due by 9/26/2025. (BG)
March 20, 2025 Filing 5 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 3/20/2025. (BG)
March 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 3/20/2025 at 2:00 PM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (previously set for 9:30 AM on 3/20/2025) (BG)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2025 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(GW)
February 25, 2025 Docket Correction re: #2 (ANSWER). Modified entry to add filer ArcBest Corporation (bl)
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by MoLo Solutions, LLC., ArcBest Corporation (Presthus, Courtney) Modified on 2/25/2025 to add filer (ArcBest Corporation). NEF regenerated (bl).
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ArcBest Corporation, MoLo Solutions, LLC from Mercer County Court, case number Not Assigned. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 100002958 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-Continent Casualty Company v. MoLo Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Represented By: Cody Nichols
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoLo Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Courtney A. Presthus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArcBest Corporation
Represented By: Courtney A. Presthus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?