Tabak v. Gray Television Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alec Tabak
Defendant: Gray Television Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00182
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Television Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WVLT-TV, Inc., Corporate Parent Gray Television, Inc. for Gray Television Group, Inc... (Proczko, Christopher)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Gray Television Group, Inc..(Proczko, Christopher)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting #5 Stipulation filed by Gray Television Group, Inc. Answer due 10/31/2018.(CS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Gray Television Group, Inc.. (Proczko, Christopher)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Proczko on behalf of Gray Television Group, Inc. (Proczko, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gray Television Group, Inc. (js)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 AO-121 Form mailed to Register of Copyrights. (js)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gray Television Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 118001453) filed by Alec Tabak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Photograph (rapper DMX), #2 Exhibit B - Article containing photograph, #3 Exhibit C - Registered Copyright #: VA 2-103-117, #4 Exhibit D - Screenshot of article and photograph, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabak v. Gray Television Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Tabak
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Television Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Proczko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?