Yost v. Pringle
Petitioner: Dale Yost
Respondent: Chad Pringle
Case Number: 3:2018cv00191
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State). Response due by 1/7/2019. (AS)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Dale Yost by Chad Pringle. (Mahoney, Michael)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #5 Report and Recommendations and dismissing Ground One of the Petition for a #1 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State). (kmk) Modified on 11/6/2018 to add additional docket text per chamber request. (as)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Dale Yost. (Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2018). (AS)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (lh)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Dale Yost. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(lh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dale Yost. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/9/2018. (as)
September 24, 2018 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 318000555 (as)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Dale Yost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Criminal Judgments - McHenry County District Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Register of Actions - McHenry County District Court, #3 Mailing Envelope)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yost v. Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Pringle
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?