Oien v. Pringle

Petitioner: Jason Wayne Oien
Respondent: Chad Pringle
Case Number: 3:2018cv00197
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #9 Report and Recommendations. Ground three of Oien's petition is dismissed. (kmk)
November 9, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State). Response due by 1/7/2019. (AS)
November 8, 2018 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Set Deadlines, Report and Recommendations, Order by Chad Pringle. (Mahoney, Michael)
October 17, 2018 9 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) filed by Jason Wayne Oien. (Objections to R&R due by 10/31/2018). (AS)
October 17, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal finding as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (AS)
October 12, 2018 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 319000021 (lh)
October 12, 2018 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal as referral judge,for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (td)
October 12, 2018 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jason Wayne Oien. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(td)
October 3, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason Wayne Oien. (AS)
October 2, 2018 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jason Wayne Oien. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/16/2018. (lh)
October 1, 2018 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jason Wayne Oien. (lh)
October 1, 2018 2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Jason Wayne Oien. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(lh)
October 1, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Wayne Oien. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oien v. Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Wayne Oien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Pringle
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?