Ping v. Aneta Parkview Health Center
Plaintiff: Michele Ping
Defendant: Aneta Parkview Health Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv00216
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aneta Parkview Health Center re #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 MEMORANDUM in Support, #13 Affidavit (Lystad, Vanessa)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Leann Gilbertson in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Aneta Parkview Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Closure Letter dated 05-31-2016)(Lystad, Vanessa)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aneta Parkview Health Center. (Lystad, Vanessa)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Aneta Parkview Health Center. (Lystad, Vanessa)
November 28, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document. Wrong motion relief selected. Clerk's office corrected motion event to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (as)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Aneta Parkview Health Center answer due 12/12/2018. (AS)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aneta Parkview Health Center re #8 Affidavit, #7 MEMORANDUM in Support, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (Lystad, Vanessa)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint re #7 MEMORANDUM in Support, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Aneta Parkview Health Center. (Lystad, Vanessa)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Aneta Parkview Health Center. (Lystad, Vanessa)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aneta Parkview Health Center. (Lystad, Vanessa) Modified on 11/28/2018 to correct motion relief. (as)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Ping. Aneta Parkview Health Center served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018 (cjs)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Michele Ping. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Michele Ping. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/9/2018. (as)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aneta Parkview Health Center. (as)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aneta Parkview Health Center (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000036) filed by Michele Ping. (Attachments: #1 Letter from EEOC re: returned mail, #2 Dismissal and Notice of Rights Letter, #3 Department of Labor and Human Rights Determination, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ping v. Aneta Parkview Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aneta Parkview Health Center
Represented By: Vanessa L. Lystad
Represented By: Lisa K. Edison-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Ping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?