Kotalik v. A.H. Bennett Company et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy Kotalik
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Goodin Company, General Engineering Development Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Greybar Electric Company, Inc., A.H. Bennett Company, Cleaver Brooks, The Jamar Company, A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc., Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Border States Industries, Inc., McMaster Carr Supply Company, Apollo Piping Supply, Inc., Foster Products Corporation, CertainTeed Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., Bell & Gossett, Grinnell Corporation, Crane Company, Carol Cable Corporation, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., CBS Corporation, Singer Safety Company, Owens-Illinois, Inc., United Conveyor Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC, Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corporation, Riley Power, Inc., Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc., Trane U.S., Inc., 3M Company, Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc., Weil McLain Company, Praxair Distribution, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Walker Jamar Company, Union Carbide Corporation and Smith-Sharpe Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00246
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 89 SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT 11 -- Complete Transcript of the Deposition of Gordon W. Hvidsten, reported December 10, 1984, in Robert Hagen v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., North Dakota District court, to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Dorothy Kotalik. (Thompson, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 88 SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT 5 -- Complete Transcript of the Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr., reported September 28, 1983, in Marjorie Matthews et. al., v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Dorothy Kotalik. (Thompson, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 86 SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT 3 -- Complete Transcript of Deposition of John J. Kotalik, deceased, Reported January 2, 2014 to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Dorothy Kotalik. (Thompson, David)
January 16, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #84 Notice of Appearance. Error in document. Clerk's office restricted access to document. (am)
January 15, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Scouton on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (am)
January 15, 2019 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Scouton, David) Modified on 1/16/2019 to correct corporate parent information. NEF regenerated (am).
January 15, 2019 Filing 84 *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Scouton on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Scouton, David) Modified on 1/16/2019 to restrict access(am).
January 15, 2019 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) Modified on 1/16/2019 to correct docket text. NEF regenerated (am).
January 15, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Thibodeau on behalf of Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Signed Pleading) (am). Modified on 1/16/2019 to attach signed pleading and to replace Main Document 82 to replace it with non-fillable PDF. NEF regenerated (am).
January 15, 2019 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) Modified on 1/16/2019 to correct docket text. NEF regenerated (am).
January 15, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Thibodeau on behalf of Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Signed Pleading) (am). Modified on 1/16/2019 to attach signed pleading and to replace Main Document 80 to replace it with non-fillable PDF. NEF regenerated (am).
January 8, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 6/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (Trial est. 10-13 days). (AS)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
January 8, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Because many emails from the court to counsel have been returned as undeliverable, all counsel are directed to review their PACER accounts to update their secondary email addresses for receipt of NEFs. (lc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2019. (lc) (Main Document 77 replaced on 1/10/2019 to correct attorney/party representation per email from Attorney Leighton and from Attorney Sorenson Brotten.) (lc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 9/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 9/13/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/19/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/30/2019. Expert Discovery due by 10/11/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 10/18/2019. Threshold Motions due by 11/27/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/27/2019. (AS)
January 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Responses due by 2/1/2019 Replies due by 2/15/2019. (js)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Per discussion at the January 8, 2019 scheduling conference, plaintiff shall file complete transcripts by January 18, 2019, as directed in the December 31, 2018 Docket Correction. Additionally, defendants' responses to plaintiff's #63 MOTION to Remand to State Court are due by February 1, 2019, and plaintiff's reply is due by February 15, 2019. (AS)
January 7, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
January 7, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #72 NOTICE. Should not be filed in ECF. In the future plaintiff should e-mail instructions to chambers (ndd_j-senechal@ndd.uscourts.gov) and defense counsel. This notice will not be restricted per chambers. (as) Modified on 1/7/2019 to correct correction per chambers. (as)
January 7, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE by Dorothy Kotalik re #3 Order,, Set Hearings, CALL-IN INFORMATION FOR TELEPHONIC RULE 25(f) PLANNING MEETING AND RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JANUARY 8, 2019 AT 9:00 A.M. C.S.T. (Thompson, David)
January 4, 2019 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Singer Safety Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
January 3, 2019 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Flom, Joel)
January 3, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS Corporation.(Flom, Joel)
January 3, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #68 STIPULATION. Filed in Error. Proposed Scheduling Plan should be e-mailed to chambers per the Order at #3 . Clerk's office restricted access to document and has informed counsel to e-mail the document in Word or Word Perfect format. (as)
January 3, 2019 Filing 68 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* STIPULATION Scheduling/Discovery Plan by 3M Company, A.H. Bennett Company, A.W. Chesterton Company, A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Border States Industries, Inc., Building Sprinkler Company, Inc., Carol Cable Corporation, CertainTeed Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Foster Products Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, General Engineering Development Corporation, Goodin Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc., Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc., Praxair Distribution, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Singer Safety Company, Trane U.S., Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Walker Jamar Company, Weil McLain Company, Zurn Industries, LLC. (Brotten, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/3/2019 to restrict access. (as) Modified on 1/10/2019 to remove incorrect filers selected by Attorney Brotten. (lc)
January 2, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse D. Mondry on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (McCarthy, Michael) Modified on 1/3/2019 to correct attorney's name. NEF regenerated (am).
January 2, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. McCarthy on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (McCarthy, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (McCarthy, Michael)
December 31, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #64 Memorandum in Support. Partial deposition transcripts filed at attachments 3, 5, 10, 11. Per Local Rule, filer should re-file complete transcripts using the Supplement event and link it to document #64 . NOTE: it appears that attachments 5 and 10 are the same transcript and should therefore only be filed one time. (lh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dorothy Kotalik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit North Dakota District Court Complaint, Dorothy Kotalik v. A.H. Bennett Company et. al., Cass County, North Dakota, East Central Judicial District, October 23, 2018, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Barry I. Castleman, Sc.D., July 18, 2008, #3 Exhibit Deposition of John J. Kotalilk, deceased, reported January 2, 2014, #4 Exhibit Defendant Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.'s Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, served in oscar Adolf et. al. v. A.P.I., Inc., et. al., United States District court for the District of North Dakota, Southwestern Division, Civil Nos. A1-89-098, et. seq., May 6, 1989, #5 Exhibit Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr., reported September 28, 1983, in Marjorie matthews, et. al., v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Civil Nos. A3-81-2, #6 Exhibit Correspondence dated June 2, 1964, from John P. Harrington, Industrial Insulation General Sales manager, The Eagle-Picher Company, to R.M. Moechan of Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corporation, #7 Exhibit Defendant Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corporation's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, served in Oscar Adolf, et. al. v. A.P.I., inc., et. al., #8 Exhibit Transcript of Trial Testimony of Dr. Barry I. Castleman, April 28, 2016, in James Rheault v. A.o. Smith Corporation, et.al., North Dakota District Court, Cass County, East Central Judicial District, Case no. 09-2014-CV-1773, #9 Exhibit A.H. Bennett Company;'s Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, served in Oscar Adolf, et. al., v. A.P.I., Inc., et. al.,served August 16, 1989, #10 Exhibit Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr., Reported September 28, 1983, in Marjorie matthews, et. al., v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al.,, #11 Exhibit Deposition of Gordon W. Hvidsten, reported December 10, 1984, in Robert Hagen v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., North Dakota District Court, Cass County,, #12 Exhibit Fargo Moorhead Insulation Job Cost Ledger)(Thompson, David)
December 28, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dorothy Kotalik. (Thompson, David)
December 27, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Thompson on behalf of Dorothy Kotalik (Thompson, David)
December 26, 2018 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CertainTeed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Saint-Gobain (Paris, France) for CertainTeed Corporation.. (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of CertainTeed Corporation (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA, Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Cropscience, Inc... (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, Inc. (Dynes, Jane)
December 21, 2018 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Electric Company re #53 Notice of Appearance, #52 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #54 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Schweigert, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Schweigert on behalf of General Electric Company (Schweigert, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David)
December 21, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #36 Answer, #37 Notice of Appearance, #38 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #39 Certificate of Service. Wrong documents attached/filed in wrong case. (These documents are for the 3:18-cv-251 case and have been filed in that case.) Counsel shall file correct documents in this Kotalik case. (lh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Russell, Jon)
December 19, 2018 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Brownson, Kristi)
December 19, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K. Brownson on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Brownson, Kristi)
December 18, 2018 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Plc for Trane U.S., Inc... (Schach, David)
December 18, 2018 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Plc for Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Schach, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord LLC for Zurn Industries, LLC.. (Salmen, Joanna)
December 17, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Stieber on behalf of A.H. Bennett Company, A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc., Border States Industries, Inc., Carol Cable Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Goodin Company, Riley Power, Inc., Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corporation, Singer Safety Company, Weil McLain Company, Zurn Industries, LLC (Stieber, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Engineering Development Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fischbach, LLC for General Engineering Development Corporation.. (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company. (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of General Engineering Development Corporation (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Border States Industries, Inc.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2018 Filing 39 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Electric Company re #38 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #37 Notice of Appearance, #36 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Schweigert, David) Modified on 12/20/2018 to restrict access (lh).
December 13, 2018 Filing 38 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David) Modified on 12/20/2018 to restrict access (lh).
December 13, 2018 Filing 37 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Schweigert on behalf of General Electric Company (Schweigert, David) Modified on 12/20/2018 to restrict access (lh).
December 13, 2018 Filing 36 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David) Modified on 12/20/2018 to restrict access (lh).
December 13, 2018 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Products Corporation. (Schach, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Foster Products Corporation. (Schach, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc... (Brees, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Praxair Distribution, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of Praxair Distribution, Inc. (Hughes, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Conveyor Corporation. (Schach, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Products Corporation. (Schach, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Brees on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Brees, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walker Jamar Company. (Leighton, Richard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Leighton on behalf of Walker Jamar Company (Leighton, Richard)
December 5, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owens-Illinois, Inc.. (Tierney, Patrick)
December 5, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Tierney on behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Tierney, Patrick)
December 5, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McMaster Carr Supply Company. (Jensen, Thomas)
December 5, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith-Sharpe Company. (Jensen, Thomas)
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. for Industrial Holdings Corporation.. (Wells, Roland)
December 5, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland John Wells, III on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Wells, Roland)
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain Company identifying Corporate Parent The Marley Company, LLC, Corporate Parent The Marley-Wylain Company, Other Affiliate SPX Corporation, Other Affiliate United Dominion Industries, Inc. for Weil McLain Company.. (Mohr, Jason)
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power Inc. for Riley Power, Inc... (Mohr, Jason)
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver Brooks identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver Brooks.. (Mohr, Jason)
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corporation.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodin Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.H. Bennett Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 22 - Deposition of William Sornsin 9-28-83 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 21 - Deposition of Bruce Bergson 7-18-2000 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 20 - Deposition of Rudolph Opp 7-18-94 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 18 - Deposition of Rudolph Opp 10-15-1991 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 17 - Deposition of James Matthews 3-24-82 vol. 2 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 16 - Deposition of James Matthews 3-24-82 vol. 1 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 15 - Deposition of James Nodsle 1-25-1983 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 14 - Deposition of Andrew Olerud Jr. 12-05-1991 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT Exhibit 12 - Deposition of William Sornsin 6-30-87 to document: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
November 29, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. Partial deposition transcripts were filed as Exhibit Nos. 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 20, 21 and 22. Per Local Rule, filer should re-file complete transcripts using the Supplement event and link to document #1 . (cjs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (cjs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A.H. Bennett Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass County District Cout, case number 09-2018-CV-3765. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119000249 filed by A.H. Bennett Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Commplaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Work History of John Kotalik, #4 Exhibit 4-Deposition of John Kotalik 1/2/2014, #5 Exhibit 5-Deposition of John Kotalik 3/21/2014, #6 Exhibit 6-Concluding Order and Judgment, #7 Exhibit 7-Article re: History of Grand Forks Air Force Base, #8 Exhibit 8-Public Law 161, #9 Exhibit 9-Public Law 85-685, #10 Exhibit 10-Public Law 87-554, #11 Exhibit 11-Article from Lincoln Star Journal, #12 Exhibit 12-Partial deposition of William Sornsin, #13 Exhibit 13-Partial Deposition of Andrew I. Olerud, Jr., #14 Exhibit 14-Partial Deposition of Andrew Olerud, Jr., #15 Exhibit 15-Partial Deposition of James Nodsle, #16 Exhibit 16-Partial Deposition of James Alex Matthews, #17 Exhibit 17-Partial Deposition of James Alex Matthews, #18 Exhibit 18-partial Deposition of Rudolph Opp, #19 Exhibit 19-Declaration of Kyle Dotson, #20 Exhibit 20-Partial Deposition of Rudolph F. Opp, #21 Exhibit 21-Partial Deposition of Bruce Bergson, #22 Exhibit 22-Partial Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr., #23 Affidavit of Heather H. Neubauer, #24 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint, #25 Exhibit 2-Answer of A.H. Bennett Company, #26 Exhibit 3-Demand for Change of Judge, #27 Exhibit 4-Answer of A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc., #28 Exhibit 5-Answer of Thomas Kuettel, #29 Exhibit 6-Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Bayer Cropscience, Inc., #30 Exhibit 7-Answer of Border States Industries, Inc., #31 Exhibit 8-Answer of Carol Cable Company, #32 Exhibit 9-Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Certainteed Corporation, #33 Exhibit 10-Answer of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., #34 Exhibit 11-Separate Answer of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., #35 Exhibit 12-Separate Answer of Fargo Moorhead Insulation Company, #36 Exhibit 13-Answer of Foster Wheeler, LLC, #37 Exhibit 14-Foster Wheeler LLC's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, #38 Exhibit 15-Answer of General Engineering Development, #39 Exhibit 16-Answer of Goodin Company, #40 Exhibit 17-Answer and Defenses of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #41 Exhibit 18-Separate Answer and Demand for Jury Trial of Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc., #42 Exhibit 19-Answer and Defenses of Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc., #43 Exhibit 20-Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc.'s Request for Admission, Interrogatories, #44 Exhibit 21-Answer of Paul W. Abbott, #45 Exhibit 22-Paul W. Abbott's Discovery to Plaintiff, #46 Exhibit 23-Plaintiff's Response to Owens Illinois Request for Admissions, #47 Exhibit 24-Answer of Riley Power Inc., #48 Exhibit 25-RSCC Wire Cable Co.'s Answer, #49 Exhibit 26-RSCC Wire Cable Co.'s Amended Answer, #50 Exhibit 27-Singer Safety Company's Answer, #51 Exhibit 28-Union Carbide's Answer, #52 Exhibit 29-Walker Jamar Co.'s Answer, #53 Exhibit 30-Weil McLain's Answer, #54 Exhibit 31-Zurn Industries' Answer, #55 Exhibit 32-Answer of Crane Co., #56 Exhibit 33-Ingersoll Rand Company's Answer, #57 Exhibit 34-Praxair's Answer to Complaint, #58 Exhibit 35-Trane's Answer to Complaint, #59 Exhibit 36-Jamar Company's Answer, #60 Exhibit 37-Hughes Letter to Boechler, #61 Certificate of Service, #62 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotalik v. A.H. Bennett Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodin Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Engineering Development Corporation
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greybar Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H. Bennett Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jamar Company
Represented By: Richard J. Leighton
Represented By: Todd E. Zimmerman
Represented By: Benjamin J. Hasbrouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Kristi K. Brownson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Represented By: Tyler Johnson Siewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. Brees
Represented By: Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Border States Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMaster Carr Supply Company
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Piping Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Scott J. Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Products Corporation
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell, Inc.
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett
Represented By: Constance N. Hofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Cable Corporation
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singer Safety Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Conveyor Corporation
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corporation
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil McLain Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jesse D. Mondry
Represented By: Michael C. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Scott J. Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Jamar Company
Represented By: Richard J. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith-Sharpe Company
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Kotalik
Represented By: Jeanette Boechler
Represented By: David C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?