Grenier v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Gary Grenier
Defendant: Interior Board of Indian Appeals, Bureau of Indian Affairs and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 3:2018cv00247
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #9 Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. (AS)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Interior Board of Indian Appeals, United States Department of the Interior. (Ross, Rebecca)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Gary Grenier. (Andrews, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Gary Grenier. (Andrews, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Incorrect Answer due deadline terminated for defendants Bureau of Indian Affairs and Interior Board of Indian Appeals. (lf)
December 19, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Summons Returned Executed. Wrong event was filed and selected incorrect parties served. Clerk's Office re-filed as a Summons Returned Executed as to USA and selected the United States Department of the Interior as the party served (as listed on the summons returned executed) at document #6 . Clerk's Office also corrected the answer due deadline. (lf)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Department of Justice (Andrews, Michael) Modified on 12/19/2018 to add party served (cjs).
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca M. Ross on behalf of Bureau of Indian Affairs, Interior Board of Indian Appeals, United States Department of the Interior (Ross, Rebecca)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of the Interior. United States Department of the Interior served on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (lf)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED AND SELECTED INCORRECT PARTIES SERVED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Grenier. Bureau of Indian Affairs served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; Interior Board of Indian Appeals served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; United States Department of the Interior served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018 (Andrews, Michael) Modified on 12/19/2018 to restrict access (lf).
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Indian Affairs, Interior Board of Indian Appeals, United States Department of the Interior, and U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (js)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs, Interior Board of Indian Appeals, United States Department of the Interior (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000082) filed by Gary Grenier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IBIA Final Decision dated 3/5/2015, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grenier v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interior Board of Indian Appeals
Represented By: Rebecca M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Rebecca M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Rebecca M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Grenier
Represented By: Michael T. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?