Selfors v. A.H. Bennett Company et al

Plaintiff: Catherine Selfors
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Singer Safety Company, Whittier Filtration, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc., United Conveyor Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC, Weil McLain Company, RCH Newco II, LLC, Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd., Goodin Company, McMaster Carr Supply Company, General Engineering Development Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, A.H. Bennett Company, Ericsson, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc., Jamar Company, The, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation of Illinois, Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., S.O.S. Products, A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Cleaver Brooks, Trane U.S., Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc., Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc., Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Industrial Contractors, Inc., Border States Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Foster Products Corporation, Burnham Holdings, Inc., Baker Manufacturing Co., CertainTeed Corporation, Crane Company, 3M Company, Honeywell, Inc., Praxair Distribution, Inc., H.B. Fuller Company, AWT Air Company, Inc., Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp., Bell & Gossett, Grinnell Corporation, Atlas Turner, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc., Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc., Carol Cable Corporation, Walker Jamar Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Apollo Piping Supply, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Raytheon Constructors, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, Smith-Sharpe Company and Baker Manufacturing Co., LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00251
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order 92 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #91 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Claire Louise Smith terminated. (AS)
January 22, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #91 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Document should have been filed as a motion. Clerks Office corrected the event from NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney to MOTION to Substitute Attorney and regenerated the NEF. (js)
January 17, 2019 91 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by David E. Scouton on behalf of Whittier Filtration, Inc. (Scouton, David) Modified on 1/22/2019 to correct event type. (js)
January 16, 2019 90 SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT 11 -- Complete Transcript of the Deposition of Gordon W. Hvidsten, reported December 10, 1984, in Robert Hagen v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., North Dakota District court, to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Catherine Selfors. (Thompson, David)
January 16, 2019 89 SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT 5 --Complete Transcript of the Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr. reported September 28, 1983, in marjorie Matthews et. al., v. The Celotex Corporation, to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Catherine Selfors. (Thompson, David)
January 16, 2019 88 SUPPLEMENT -EXHIBIT 3 -- Complete Transcript of the Deposition of A. Duane Selfors, reported July 23, 1992, in Evin, et. al., v. A.H. Bennett Company, et. al., to document: #64 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,, by Catherine Selfors. (Thompson, David)
January 15, 2019 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 1/15/2019. (lc)
January 15, 2019 86 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 7/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (Trial Est. 10-13 Days). (AS)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) Modified on 1/17/2019 to correct hearing time in the docket entry; correct time is 10:00am. NEF regenerated. (lc)
January 15, 2019 84 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order 83 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 11/15/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/20/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/31/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/2/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 12/20/2019. Threshold Motions due by 1/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/24/2020. (AS) Modified on 1/15/2019 to correct Plaintiff Expert Witness due date to 9/20/19; NEF regenerated (lh).
January 15, 2019 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc's (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Scouton, David) Modified on 1/16/2019 to correct corporate parent. (as)
January 15, 2019 81 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Scouton on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Scouton, David) (Main Document 81 replaced on 1/16/2019 with non-fillable PDF.) (as)
January 15, 2019 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AWT Air Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Aqua Alliance Inc., Other Affiliate Research-Cottrell for AWT Air Company, Inc... (Brotten, Elizabeth)
January 15, 2019 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc. for Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc... (Thibodeau, Matthew)
January 15, 2019 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Thibodeau on behalf of Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Main Document 78 replaced on 1/16/2019 with non-fillable PDF. NEF Regenerated.) (as)
January 15, 2019 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Contractors, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) Modified on 1/16/2019 to remove corporate parent text. (as)
January 15, 2019 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Thibodeau on behalf of Industrial Contractors, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Main Document 76 replaced on 1/16/2019 with non-fillable PDF. NEF Regenerated.) (as)
January 15, 2019 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) Modified on 1/16/2019 to remove corporate parent text per pleading. (as)
January 15, 2019 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Thibodeau on behalf of Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew) (Main Document 74 replaced on 1/16/2019 with non-fillable PDF. NEF Regenerated.) (as)
January 14, 2019 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Manufacturing Co., LLC. (Neubauer, Heather)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 72 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #70 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Claire Louise Smith terminated. (AS)
January 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 2/8/2019, Replies due by 2/22/2019. (js)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 71 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Per the agreement of the parties, plaintiff shall file complete transcripts by January 18, 2019, as directed in the January 2, 2019 Docket Correction. Additionally, defendants' responses to plaintiff's #63 MOTION to Remand to State Court are due by February 8, 2019, and plaintiff's reply is due by February 22, 2019. (AS)
January 11, 2019 70 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AWT Air Company, Inc.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2019 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.. (Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
January 7, 2019 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
January 7, 2019 67 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc..(Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
January 7, 2019 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc... (Brees, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Brees on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Brees, Daniel)
January 2, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #64 Memorandum in Support. Partial deposition transcripts filed as Exhibit Nos. 3, 5, 10 and 11. Per Local Rule, filer should re-file a complete transcript using the Supplement event and link it to document #64 . In addition, an attachment to Exhibit 3 contains personal identifying information and should be redacted when re-filed. (cjs)
December 31, 2018 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION to Remand filed by Catherine Selfors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint -- Catherine Selfors North Dakota District Court, East Central Judicial District, Cass County, #2 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Barry I. Castleman, Sc.D., July 18, 2008, #3 Exhibit 3-Deposition of Duane Selfors, deceased, #4 Exhibit 4-Defendant Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.'s Answers to Plaiontiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, served in Oscar Adolf, et. al., v. A.P.I., Inc., et. al.,, United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Civil Nos. A1-89-098, et. seq., May 6, 1989, #5 Exhibit 5-Deposition of William C. Sornsin, reported September 28, 1983, in Marjoria Matthews, et. al., v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Civil Nos. A3-81-2, #6 Exhibit 6-Correspondence dated June 2, 1964, from John P. Harrington, Industrial Insulation General Sales Manager, The Eagle Picher Company, to R.M/ Moechan of Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corporation, #7 Exhibit 7-Defendant Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corporation's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, served in Oscar Adolf, et. al. v. A.P.I., Inc., et. al., #8 Exhibit 8- Partial Transcript of Trial Testimony of Dr. Barry I. Castleman, April 28, 2016, in James Rheault v. A.O. Smith Corporation, et. al., North Dakota District Court, Cass Couinty, East Central Judicial District, Case No. 09-2014-1773, #9 Exhibit 9- Defendant A.H. Bennett Company's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, served in Ascar Adolf,. et. al., v. A.P.I., Inc., et. al., August 16, 1989, #10 Exhibit 10-Deposition of William C, Sornsin, Reported September 28, 1983, in Marjorie Matthews et. al., v. The Celotex Corporation et. al.,, #11 Exhibit 11-Deposition of Gordon Hvidsten, reported December 10, 1984, in Robert Hagen v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., North Dakota District Court, Cass County, #12 Exhibit 12-Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Job Cost Ledger)(Thompson, David) Modified on 1/2/2019 to add exhibit numbers(cjs).
December 31, 2018 63 MOTION to Remand by Catherine Selfors. (Thompson, David)
December 31, 2018 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Thompson on behalf of Catherine Selfors (Thompson, David)
December 26, 2018 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raytheon Constructors, Inc.. (Parrington, Jon)
December 26, 2018 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CertainTeed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Saint-Gobain (Paris, France) for CertainTeed Corporation.. (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of CertainTeed Corporation (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA, Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience, Inc... (Dynes, Jane)
December 26, 2018 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Dynes, Jane)
December 21, 2018 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. McCarthy on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (McCarthy, Michael)
December 21, 2018 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Mondry, Jesse)
December 21, 2018 52 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Mondry, Jesse)
December 21, 2018 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse D. Mondry on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Mondry, Jesse)
December 20, 2018 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Russell, Jon)
December 19, 2018 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Brownson, Kristi)
December 19, 2018 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K. Brownson on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Brownson, Kristi)
December 19, 2018 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodin Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2018 46 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Goodin Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2018 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Plc for Trane U.S., Inc... (Schach, David)
December 18, 2018 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Plc for Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Schach, David)
December 17, 2018 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord LLC for Zurn Industries, LLC.. (Salmen, Joanna)
December 17, 2018 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodrich Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies, Inc. for Goodrich Corporation.. (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Engineering Development Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fischbach, LLC for General Engineering Development Corporation.. (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company. (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of Raytheon Constructors, Inc. (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of General Engineering Development Corporation (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company (Parrington, Jon)
December 17, 2018 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Border States Industries, Inc.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 13, 2018 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Electric Company re #33 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #31 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #32 Notice of Appearance (Schweigert, David)
December 13, 2018 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David)
December 13, 2018 32 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Schweigert on behalf of General Electric Company (Schweigert, David)
December 13, 2018 31 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David)
December 13, 2018 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company. (Neubauer, Heather)
December 13, 2018 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc., The for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct corporate parent status. (rh)
December 13, 2018 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Praxair Distribution, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
December 12, 2018 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of Praxair Distribution, Inc. (Hughes, John)
December 12, 2018 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Conveyor Corporation. (Schach, David)
December 12, 2018 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by S.O.S. Products. (Schach, David)
December 12, 2018 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.B. Fuller Company. (Schach, David)
December 12, 2018 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Products Corporation. (Schach, David)
December 11, 2018 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. for Industrial Holdings Corporation.. (Wells, Roland)
December 11, 2018 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland John Wells, III on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Wells, Roland)
December 10, 2018 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by S.O.S. Products. (Schach, David)
December 6, 2018 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walker Jamar Company. (Leighton, Richard)
December 6, 2018 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Leighton on behalf of Walker Jamar Company (Leighton, Richard)
December 5, 2018 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Baker Manufacturing Co.. (Neubauer, Heather)
December 5, 2018 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owens-Illinois, Inc.. (Tierney, Patrick)
December 5, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Tierney on behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Tierney, Patrick)
December 5, 2018 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Flom, Joel)
December 5, 2018 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith-Sharpe Company. (Jensen, Thomas)
December 5, 2018 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Smith-Sharpe Company. (Jensen, Thomas)
December 5, 2018 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McMaster Carr Supply Company. (Jensen, Thomas)
December 4, 2018 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.H. Bennett Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2018 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate RSCC Wire & Cable LLC for Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp... (Brotten, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power Inc. for Riley Power, Inc... (Mohr, Jason)
December 4, 2018 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain Company identifying Corporate Parent The Marley-Wylain Company, Corporate Parent The Marley Company LLC, Other Affiliate SPX Corporation, Other Affiliate United Dominion Industries, Inc. for Weil McLain Company.. (Mohr, Jason)
December 4, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver Brooks identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver Brooks.. (Mohr, Jason)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
November 30, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Affidavit, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (rh)
November 30, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (rh)
November 30, 2018 2 AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten re #1 Notice of Removal by A.H. Bennett Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cass Co. Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer of A.H. Bennett Company, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer of Border States Industries, Inc., #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Greg Thrall, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer of Foster Wheeler, LLC, #6 Exhibit 6 - Paul W. Abbott Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answer and Defenses of Industrial Contractors, Inc., #8 Exhibit 8 - Industrial Contractors Authorizations directed to Plaintiff, #9 Exhibit 9 - Northwest Iron Fireman's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - Answer of Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc., #11 Exhibit 11 - Affidavit of Maury Kamins, #12 Exhibit 12 - Answer of Owens-Illinois, Inc., #13 Exhibit 13 - Answer of Crane Co., #14 Exhibit 14 - Answer of Ingersoll-Rand Company, #15 Exhibit 15 - Answer of United Conveyor Corporation, #16 Exhibit 16 - Answer of H.B. Fuller Company, #17 Exhibit 17 - Answer of Trane U.S., Inc., #18 Exhibit 18 - Answer of Industrial Holdings Corporation, #19 Exhibit 19 - Answer of Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc., #20 Exhibit 20 - Answer of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, #21 Exhibit 21 - Answer of Singer Safety Company, #22 Exhibit 22 - Answer and Answer to Crossclaims of Research-Cottrell, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, #23 Exhibit 23 - Answer of Riley Power, Inc., #24 Exhibit 24 - Answer of Weil-McLain, #25 Exhibit 25 - Answer of Whittier Filtration, Inc., #26 Exhibit 26 - Answer of Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company, #27 Exhibit 27 - Affidavit of Jon Parrington Certifying Correct Identity of Manufacturer of Product, #28 Exhibit 28 - Answer of McMaster Carr Supply Company, #29 Exhibit 29 Answer of ITT Corporation (Bell & Gossett), #30 Exhibit 30 - Answer of Goulds Pumps LLC, #31 Exhibit 31 - Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.'s Answer, #32 Exhibit 32 - Answer of Goodrich Corporation, #33 Exhibit 33 - Answer of General Engineering Development Corporation, #34 Exhibit 34 - Answer of Raytheon Constructors, Inc., #35 Exhibit 35 - Answer and Defenses of CBS Corporation, #36 Exhibit 36 - Answer of Carol Cable Company, #37 Exhibit 37 - Answer of RCH Newco II, LLC, #38 Exhibit 38 - Answer of Zurn Industries, LLC, #39 Exhibit 39 - Praxair Distribution, Inc.'s Answer, #40 Exhibit 40 - Answer of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., #41 Exhibit 41 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Bayer CropScience, Inc., #42 Exhibit 42 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses of CertainTeed Corporation, #43 Exhibit 43 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Union Carbide Corporation, #44 Exhibit 44 - Answer of Foster Products Corporation, #45 Exhibit 45 - Answer of The Jamar Company, #46 Exhibit 46 - Apollo Piping Supply, Inc.'s Answer, #47 Exhibit 47 - Answer of Walker Jamar Company, #48 Exhibit 48 - Answer of RSCC Wire & Cable , LLC, #49 Exhibit 49 - Answer of General Electric Company, #50 Exhibit 50 - Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company's Answer, #51 Exhibit 51 - Affidavit of Edward Gardiner Certifying Non-Manufacturer Status) (rh).
November 30, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A.H. Bennett Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass Co. District Court, case number 09-2018-cv-3871. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000263. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cass Co. Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - 1990 Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Work History of Duane Selfors from Prior Lawsuit, #4 Exhibit 4 - 7/23/92 Deposition of Duane Selfors, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1/20/97 Deposition of Duane Selfors, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order and Judgment Dismissing Prior Lawsuit, #7 Exhibit 7 - Minot Air Force Base History, #8 Exhibit 8 - 7/6/55 Article "To Break Ground for Base at Minot", #9 Exhibit 9 - 10/26/55 Article "Kiewit Bids Low at Minot", #10 Exhibit 10 - 10/27/55 Article "Iowa Firm Low on Minot Bids", #11 Exhibit 11 - 3/7/58 Article "Minot Air Base Gets More Funds", #12 Exhibit 12 - 5/12/55 Article "Minot Air Base Bid Opening Set", #13 Exhibit 13 - Public Law 534, #14 Exhibit 14 - Public Law 765, #15 Exhibit 15 - Public Law 85-685, #16 Exhibit 16 - Public Law 87-554, #17 Exhibit 17 - 6/14/61 Article "Minot Area Will Have ICBM Sites", #18 Exhibit 18 - 10/4/61 Article "Minuteman Base Aide is Assigned", #19 Exhibit 19 - 11/24/61 Article "First Minuteman Property Bought from Kief Couple", #20 Exhibit 20 - 12/21/61 Article "$67 Million Low on Missile Work", #21 Exhibit 21 - Specifications for SAC Missile Facility, #22 Exhibit 22 - 6/30/87 Deposition of William Sornsin, #23 Exhibit 23 - 9/28/83 Deposition of William Sornsin, #24 Exhibit 24 - 8/21/91 Deposition of Herbert Gartner, #25 Exhibit 25 - 1/18/83 Deposition of Andrew Olerud, Jr., #26 Exhibit 26 - 12/5/91 Deposition of Andrew Olerud, Jr., #27 Exhibit 27 - 1/25/83 Deposition of James Nodsle), #28 Exhibit 28 - 3/23/82 Deposition of James Matthews (Vol. 1), #29 Exhibit 29 - 3/24/18 Deposition of James Matthews (Vol. 2), #30 Exhibit 30 - 10/15/91 Deposition of Rudolph Opp, #31 Exhibit 31 - 7/18/94 Deposition of Rudolph Opp, #32 Exhibit 32 - 7/18/00 Deposition of Bruce Bergson, #33 Exhibit 33 - Declaration of Kyle Dotson, #34 Exhibit 34 - 4/6/82 Deposition of Noralf Tweit), #35 Civil Cover Sheet) (rh). Modified on 1/3/2019 to correct docket text. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selfors v. A.H. Bennett Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singer Safety Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittier Filtration, Inc.
Represented By: Claire Louise Smith
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Conveyor Corporation
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil McLain Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCH Newco II, LLC
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodin Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMaster Carr Supply Company
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Engineering Development Corporation
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H. Bennett Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamar Company, The
Represented By: Todd E. Zimmerman
Represented By: Benjamin J. Hasbrouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinkmann Sons Corporation of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.O.S. Products
Represented By: David T. Schach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Kristi K. Brownson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tyler Johnson Siewert
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. Brees
Represented By: Robert Bennett
Represented By: Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Border States Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Products Corporation
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Fuller Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWT Air Company, Inc.
Represented By: Claire Louise Smith
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Turner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jesse D. Mondry
Represented By: Michael C. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Cassandra A. Marka
Represented By: Scott J. Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Cable Corporation
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Jamar Company
Represented By: Richard J. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Piping Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Cassandra A. Marka
Represented By: Scott J. Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith-Sharpe Company
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Manufacturing Co., LLC
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Selfors
Represented By: Jeanette Boechler
Represented By: David C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?