NuTech Orchard Removal, LLC v. DuraTech Industries International, Inc.

Plaintiff: NuTech Orchard Removal, LLC
Defendant: DuraTech Industries International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00256
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
December 21, 2018 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by DuraTech Industries International, Inc. (as)
December 21, 2018 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to DuraTech Industries International, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/4/2019. (lh)
December 18, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DuraTech Industries International, Inc.. DuraTech Industries International, Inc. waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Eichmann, Justin)
December 18, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by D.C. Woody Bradford on behalf of DuraTech Industries International, Inc. (Bradford, D.C.)
December 6, 2018 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to NuTech Orchard Removal, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/20/2018. (js)
December 6, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to DuraTech Industries International, Inc. (js)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against DuraTech Industries International, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000296) filed by NuTech Orchard Removal, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NuTech Orchard Removal, LLC v. DuraTech Industries International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuraTech Industries International, Inc.
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Represented By: D.C. Woody Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NuTech Orchard Removal, LLC
Represented By: Steven James Leibel
Represented By: Paul C. Germolus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?