PW Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Kaler

Appellant: PW Enterprises, Inc., Susan Bala and Robert Carlson
Appellee: Kip M Kaler
Case Number: 3:2018cv00263
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: Susan Bala's appeal. (as)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting #12 Stipulation of Dismissal of Susan Bala's Appeal filed by Susan Bala. (NH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Agreement to Dismiss Susan Bala's Appeal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023 by Susan Bala. (Kinsella, Steven)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven R. Kinsella. (cjs)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven Kinsella (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000460) by Susan Bala. (Kinsella, Steven) Modified on 1/16/2019 to add receipt number (cjs).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #8 Stipulation filed by Susan Bala. Appellants' briefs are due by 2/18/2019. Responsive briefs are due by 3/18/2019. Reply briefs, if any, are due by 4/1/2019. (AS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION by Susan Bala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Raum, Michael) Modified on 1/15/2019 to remove 'Proposed Sealed Document' language. (js)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT (Appellant Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues on Appeal) to document: #3 Bankruptcy Appeal by Susan Bala. (as)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT (Appellant Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues on Appeal) to document: #2 Bankruptcy Appeal by Robert Carlson. (as)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT (Statement of Issues on Appeal) to document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by PW Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record on Appeal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 21, #13 Exhibit 22, #14 Exhibit 23, #15 Exhibit 24, #16 Exhibit 28, #17 Exhibit 37, #18 Exhibit 41, #19 Exhibit 48, #20 Exhibit 50, #21 Exhibit 52, #22 Exhibit 57, #23 Exhibit 58, #24 Exhibit 59, #25 Exhibit 60, #26 Exhibit 62, #27 Exhibit 63, #28 Exhibit 68, #29 Exhibit 74, #30 Exhibit 76, #31 Exhibit 40, #32 Exhibit 7)(as)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The parties shall jointly propose a briefing schedule and file it with the court by January 14, 2019. (AS)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Record on Appeal) Bankruptcy Court case number 04-30236. File received from Bankruptcy Court filed by Susan Bala.(as)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Record on Appeal) Bankruptcy Court case number 04-30236. File received from Bankruptcy Court filed by Robert Carlson.(as)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Record on Appeal) Bankruptcy Court case number 04-30236. File received from Bankruptcy Court filed by PW Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Order, #2 Docket Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PW Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Kaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PW Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Martin J. Foley
Represented By: Leanna M. Anderson
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Susan Bala
Represented By: Michael S. Raum
Represented By: Bruce A. Schoenwald
Represented By: Steven Robert Kinsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert Carlson
Represented By: Joel M. Fremstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kip M Kaler
Represented By: Jonathan R. Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?