Bala v. PW Enterprises, Inc. et al

Appellee: PW Enterprises, Inc. and Kip M Kaler
Appellant: Susan Bala
Case Number: 3:2018cv00264
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT.(as)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting #6 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Susan Bala. (NH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal Agreement to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023 by Susan Bala. (Raum, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #4 Stipulation filed by Susan Bala. Appellants' briefs are due by 2/18/2019. Responsive briefs are due by 3/18/2019. Reply briefs, if any, are due by 4/1/2019. (AS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION by Susan Bala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Raum, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2019 to remove excess attachment description. (rh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT (Statement of Issues on Appeal, Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal) to document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Susan Bala. (NOTE: Per counsel, the pleading is captioned incorrectly.) (as)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The parties shall jointly propose a briefing schedule and file it with the court by January 14, 2019. (AS)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Record on Appeal) Bankruptcy Court case number 17-07034. File received from Bankruptcy Court filed by Susan Bala. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket, #2 Bankruptcy Order)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bala v. PW Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PW Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Martin J. Foley
Represented By: Leanna M. Anderson
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kip M Kaler
Represented By: Jonathan R. Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Susan Bala
Represented By: Michael S. Raum
Represented By: Bruce A. Schoenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?