General Irrigation, Inc. v. Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: General Irrigation, Inc.
Defendant: Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00078
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
2 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing: Early Settlement Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. See written instructions at Doc. #21 . (LF)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/8/2021 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 7/31/2020). See written instructions at Doc. #22 . (AS) Modified on 5/13/2020 to correct year. NEF Regenerated. (as)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #38 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Reschedule Settlement Conference; granting #39 Motion to Continue Trial. The Early Settlement set for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM is CONTINUED to a date to be determined. Fact discovery is due by 10/15/2020. Discovery motions are due by 10/29/2020. Dispositive motions are due by 11/15/2020. Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/21/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (Previously set for 8/18/2020 at 09:00 AM). Jury Trial RESET for 6/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (Previously set for 8/18/2020 at 09:30 AM). (Trial est. 3 days). (LF)
May 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/15/2020. Discovery Motions due by 10/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2020. Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. The Early Settlement Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM is CONTINUED to a date to be determined. (LF)
May 7, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Continue Trial by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.. (Stanley, Caren)
May 7, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Scheduling Order,, and Reschedule Settlement Conference by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.. (Stanley, Caren)
April 14, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Hearing: Early Settlement Conference RESET for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 4/2/2020). See written instructions at Doc. #21 . (AS)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (Text Only) ORDER Cancelling Hearing by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 04/02/2020 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal is postponed to a date to be determined. (AS)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
January 22, 2020 Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Jury Trial set for 8/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 (3 days) before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (changes as to presiding judge only) (kmk)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Text Only) ORDER re #32 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference RESET for 04/02/2020 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. See instructions at Doc. #21 . (previously set for 01/22/2020) (CS)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting joint #32 Motion to Amend/Correct the #19 Scheduling Order. (CS)
January 16, 2020 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 4/15/2020. Discovery Motions due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2020. (CS)
January 16, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Clerk's office corrected motion relief to MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Clerk's office also removed incorrect filer (General Irrigation, Inc.) Counsel should only select the filers he/she represents. (as)
January 15, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Amend #19 Scheduling Order by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc., (Stanley, Caren) Modified on 1/16/2020 to correct motion relief and remove filer. NEF Regenerated. (as) Modified on 2/18/2020 to add link (am).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #29 Stipulation for a Protective Order. (AS)
November 20, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.. (Stanley, Caren)
November 20, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #28 STIPULATION. Error in document. Clerks office restricted access to document per request of filer. (js)
November 15, 2019 Filing 28 *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* STIPULATION for Protective Order by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. (Stanley, Caren) Modified on 11/20/2019 to restrict access. (js)
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Mid-Discovery Status Conference held on 10/10/2019. (lc)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Adopting #25 Stipulation For Partial Dismissal of Counterclaim by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (CM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION re #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, For Partial Dismissal of Counterclaim by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.. (Stanley, Caren)
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Irrigation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon Caren Stanley)(McCamy, Ryan) Modified on 7/3/2019 to restrict access. (js)
July 3, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #24 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Error in document. Clerks office restricted access to document per request of filer. (js)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 8/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (Trial est. 3 days). (CS)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate call into chambers at (701) 297-7070. (CS)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 1/15/2020. Discovery Motions due by 2/1/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/2/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/1/2019. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/15/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 10/1/2019. Threshold Motions due by 10/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2020. (CS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2019. (lc)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal set for 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS) Modified on 6/3/2019 to restrict access; hearing terminated (lh).
June 3, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #17 Order. Filed in error. Clerk's office restricted access and terminated hearing. The Scheduling Conference will remain as previously scheduled for 6/13/19 at 9:00 AM (per Order at #14 ). (lh)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Counterclaim #13 , COUNTERCLAIM against Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. by General Irrigation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1Affidavit of Service)(McCamy, Ryan) Modified on 6/3/2019 to remove excess docket text(am).
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/28/2019. (js) Modified on 5/21/2019 to restrict access. (js)
May 21, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #15 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment. Filed in error. Clerks office restricted access to document. Case already reassigned at docket entry 10 . (js)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against General Irrigation, Inc. by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions of Sale, #2 Exhibit B - Invoices)(Stanley, Caren) Modified on 5/16/2019 to add exhibit letters. (rh)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. answer due 5/15/2019. (lc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulated by General Irrigation, Inc. by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.. (Stanley, Caren)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (js) Modified on 5/9/2019 to clarify Magistrate Judge's role in further proceedings. NEF regenerated (am).
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by General Irrigation, Inc. (js)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Irrigation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon C. Stanley)(McCamy, Ryan) Modified on 5/6/2019 to remove excess docket text (cjs).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc., answer due 5/8/2019. (AS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.. (Stanley, Caren)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to General Irrigation, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/16/2019. (lh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/16/2019. (lh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (lh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. (lh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. from Dickey County, case number 11-2019-CV-00023. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000289 filed by Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notification of Assignment and Case Number, #4 Exhibit D - Demand for Change of Judge, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Kris Sayre, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Irrigation, Inc. v. Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brent J. Edison
Represented By: Caren W. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Irrigation, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. McCamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?