Stroh v. Garrison Property & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Kelly L. Stroh
Defendant: Garrison Property & Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00130
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
2 Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 10/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Peter D. Welte. (trial est. 4 days) (CS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call into chambers at (701) 297-7070. (CS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Discovery Motions due by 6/15/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/1/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/1/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/20/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 1/1/2020. Amend Pleadings due by 1/1/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 2/1/2020. Threshold Motions due by 2/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2020. (CS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 8/13/2019. (lc)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Garrison Property & Casualty Company. (Vendsel, Jason)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrison Property & Casualty Company from Grand Forks County, case number 18-2019-CV-00978. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 119001137 filed by Garrison Property & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Summons, #2 Second Amended Complaint & Jury Demand, #3 Admission of Service, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Affidavit of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroh v. Garrison Property & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly L. Stroh
Represented By: Amanda Marie Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?