Berdahl v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Timothy B. Berdahl
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00132
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
2 Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States of America. (Rockstad, Kent)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case.(kmk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 8/30/2019. (AS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by United States of America. (Rockstad, Kent)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Barnes County District Court, case number: 02-2019-CV-00126, filed by United States of America.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Barnes County Summons, #3 Exhibit B-0 - Barnes County Complaint, #4 Exhibit B-1 - Warranty Deed, #5 Exhibit B-2 - Contract for Deed, #6 Exhibit B-3 - Quit Claim Deed, #7 Exhibit B-4 - Preliminary Title Opinion, #8 Exhibit C - U.S. Bank, N.A.'s Answer)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berdahl v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin James Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kent Rockstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy B. Berdahl
Represented By: Paul Ryan Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?