Wallock v. A.H. Bennett Company et al
Plaintiff: Sally Wallock
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., S.O.S. Products, Whittier Filtration, Inc., Owens-Illinois, Inc., United Conveyor Corporation, Hobart Brothers Company, Grinnell Corporation, Weil McLain Company, Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd., Goodin Company, Lennox Industries, Inc., Singer Safety Company, Rockwell Automation, General Engineering Development Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, A.H. Bennett Company, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc., Jamar Company, The, Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Trane U.S., Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc., Baker Manufacturing Company, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Industrial Contractors, Inc., Smith-Sharpe Company, Crane-Johnson Company, Goodrich Corporation, McMaster Carr Supply Company, Lincoln Electric Company, Power Process Equipment, Inc., Foster Products Corporation, CertainTeed Corporation, Burnham LLC, 3M Company, Walker Jamar Company, Honeywell, Inc., Praxair Distribution, Inc., H.B. Fuller Company, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, RCH Newco II, LLC, AWT Air Company, Inc., Bell & Gossett, Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company, Victor H. Leeby Company, Linde, LLC, Atlas Turner, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc., Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc., Peerless Industries, Inc., Cleaver Brooks, Division of Aqua Chem. Inc., Crane Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Apollo Piping Supply, Inc., Raytheon Constructors, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Zurn Industries, LLC and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00142
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham LLC identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham LLC.. (Neubauer, Heather)
September 4, 2019 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Brownson, Kristi)
September 4, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K. Brownson on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Brownson, Kristi)
August 29, 2019 Filing 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company. (Neubauer, Heather)
August 29, 2019 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
August 29, 2019 Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Neubauer, Heather)
August 27, 2019 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sally Wallock. (Thompson, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 8/20/2019. (DR #190820-001 JS Chambers Recorder) (lc)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Discovery Motions due by 2/1/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/15/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/17/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 2/21/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 9/27/2019. Amend Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Amend Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 9/27/2019. Nondispositive Motions due by 3/13/2020. Threshold Motions due by 4/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020. (CS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (trial est. 10-13 days) (CS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Hearing:Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call into Chambers at (701) 297-7070. (CS) Modified on 8/20/2019 to correct time of hearing. NEF regenerated (lf).
August 19, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Mugaas on behalf of Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company (Mugaas, Emily)
August 19, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Mugaas on behalf of Burnham LLC (Mugaas, Emily)
August 19, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Mugaas on behalf of Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Mugaas, Emily)
August 19, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Mugaas on behalf of Baker Manufacturing Company, LLC (Mugaas, Emily)
August 19, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #78 AFFIDAVIT. Clerks office added exhibit numbers to docket text. (js)
August 19, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra A. Marka on behalf of Apollo Piping Supply, Inc. (Marka, Cassandra)
August 19, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra A. Marka on behalf of Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc. (Marka, Cassandra)
August 19, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Landa on behalf of Apollo Piping Supply, Inc. (Landa, Scott)
August 19, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Landa on behalf of Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc. (Landa, Scott)
August 19, 2019 Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raytheon Constructors, Inc.. (Parrington, Jon)
August 19, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of Raytheon Constructors, Inc. (Parrington, Jon)
August 15, 2019 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Heather H. Neubauer re #77 Response to Motion by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service by Metro Legal, served personally upon Plaintiffs counsel, Jeanette Boechler, dated July 12, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - Armstrong World Industries, Inc.s (AWI), Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust Proof of Claim Form, #3 Exhibit 3 - ACandS Asbestos Settlement Trust Claim Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Combustion Engineering Trust Claim Form)(Neubauer, Heather) Modified on 8/19/2019 to add exhibit numbers to docket text. (js)
August 15, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE to Motion re #48 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
August 12, 2019 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Edison, Brent)
August 12, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent J. Edison on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation (Edison, Brent)
August 7, 2019 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation.. (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Schach on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobart Brothers Company identifying Corporate Parent ITW Universal LLC, Corporate Parent Illinois Tool Works Inc. for Hobart Brothers Company.. (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Schach on behalf of Hobart Brothers Company (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc. for Lincoln Electric Company.. (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Schach on behalf of Lincoln Electric Company (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automation. (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Schach on behalf of Rockwell Automation (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Plc for Trane U.S., Inc... (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Schach on behalf of Trane U.S., Inc. (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Products Corporation. (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Schach on behalf of Foster Products Corporation (Schach, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.B. Fuller Company. (Russell, Jon)
August 7, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon R Russell on behalf of H.B. Fuller Company (Russell, Jon)
August 7, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Doely on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Doely, Peter)
August 7, 2019 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (McCarthy, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. McCarthy on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (McCarthy, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by S.O.S. Products. (Russell, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon R Russell on behalf of S.O.S. Products (Russell, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Plc for Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Russell, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon R Russell on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Russell, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Conveyor Corporation. (Russell, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon R Russell on behalf of United Conveyor Corporation (Russell, Jon)
August 1, 2019 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #48 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sally Wallock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration of Barry I. Castleman, Sc.D., July 18, 2008, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Defendant Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.'s Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, served in Oscar Adolf, et. al., v. A.P.I., Inc., et. al.,, United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Civil Nos. A1-89-098, et. seq., May 6, 1989, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Deposition of William C. Sornsin, reported September 28, 1983, in Marjoria Matthews, et. al., v. The Celotex Corporation, et. al., United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Civil Nos. A3-81-2, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Correspondence dated June 2, 1964, from John P. Harrington, Industrial Insulation General Sales Manager, The Eagle Picher Company, to R.M/ Moechan of Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corporation, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Defendant Owens-Corning Fiberglas Corporation's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, served in Oscar Adolf, et. al. v. A.P.I., Inc., et. al., served in Oscar Adolf, et. al., v. A.P.I., Inc., et. al.,, United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, #6 Exhibit 6 -- Transcript of Trial Testimony of Dr. Barry I. Castleman, April 28, 2016, in James Rheault v. A.O. Smith Corporation, et. al., North Dakota District Court, Cass County, East Central Judicial District, Case No. 09-2014-1773)(Thompson, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sally Wallock. (Thompson, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by Sally Wallock of Waiver of Certain Claims Against Defendant Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Thompson, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Thompson on behalf of Sally Wallock (Thompson, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Flom, Joel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Flom, Joel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Mazarin Inc. for Asbestos Corporation, Ltd... (Flom, Joel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell, Inc.. (Flom, Joel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodrich Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Goodrich Corporation.. (Parrington, Jon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Parrington, Jon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Power Process Equipment, Inc.. (Bren, Gerald)
July 25, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald H. Bren on behalf of Power Process Equipment, Inc. (Bren, Gerald)
July 25, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walker Jamar Company. (Leighton, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Leighton on behalf of Walker Jamar Company (Leighton, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Engineering Development Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fischbach, LLC for General Engineering Development Corporation.. (Parrington, Jon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of General Engineering Development Corporation (Parrington, Jon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company. (Parrington, Jon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company (Parrington, Jon)
July 24, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Clerk's office added links. (am)
July 23, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Electric Company re #28 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #29 NOTICE of Appearance, #30 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Schweigert, David) Modified on 7/24/2019 to add links (am).
July 23, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Schweigert on behalf of General Electric Company (Schweigert, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Electric Company. (Schweigert, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RCH Newco II, LLC identifying Other Affiliate H.H. Robertson Company, Other Affiliate Robertson Ceco Corporation for RCH Newco II, LLC.. (Salmen, Joanna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord LLC for Zurn Industries, LLC.. (Salmen, Joanna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane-Johnson Company. (Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart on behalf of Crane-Johnson Company (Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc... (Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Brees on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Brees, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. Identifying Other Affiliate Dow, Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation. (Dynes, Jane) Modified on 7/22/2019 to add other affiliate. (rh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Dynes, Jane)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CertainTeed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Saint-Gobain (Paris, France) for CertainTeed Corporation.. (Dynes, Jane)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of CertainTeed Corporation (Dynes, Jane)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA, Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Cropscience, Inc... (Dynes, Jane)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, Inc. (Dynes, Jane)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Singer Safety Company. (Harvey, Elena)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.. (Harvey, Elena)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lennox Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lennox International for Lennox Industries, Inc... (Mohr, Jason)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver Brooks, Division of Aqua Chem. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver Brooks, Division of Aqua Chem. Inc... (Mohr, Jason)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain Company identifying Corporate Parent SPX Corporation, Other Affiliate The Marley Company, LLC, Other Affiliate The Marley-Wylain Company for Weil McLain Company.. (Mohr, Jason)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power Inc. for Riley Power, Inc... (Mohr, Jason)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Wells, Roland)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland John Wells, III on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Wells, Roland)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AWT Air Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Aqua Alliance Inc., Other Affiliate Research-Cottrell, Inc. for AWT Air Company, Inc... (Brotten, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodin Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2018-CV-02167. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000409 filed by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Defendants Listed by Counsel, #3 Affidavit of Counsel, Heather H. Neubauer and State Court Records Part 1 of 10 (Exhibits 1 - 58), #4 State Court Records Part 2 of 10 (Exhibits 59 - 101), #5 State Court Records Part 3 of 10 (Exhibits 102 - 134), #6 State Court Records Part 4 of 10 (Exhibits 135 - 183), #7 State Court Records Part 5 of 10 (Exhibits 184 - 188), #8 State Court Records Part 6 of 10 (Exhibits 189 - 196), #9 State Court Records Part 7 of 10 (Exhibits 197 - 205), #10 State Court Records Part 8 of 10 (Exhibits 223 - 222), #11 State Court Records Part 9 of 10 (Exhibits 224 - 229), #12 State Court Records Part 10 of 10 (Exhibits 230 - 250))(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallock v. A.H. Bennett Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Boiler Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.O.S. Products
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Charles H. Becker
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittier Filtration, Inc.
Represented By: Claire Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Conveyor Corporation
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Charles H. Becker
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brothers Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil McLain Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodin Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennox Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singer Safety Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elena D. Harvey, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Charles H. Becker
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Engineering Development Corporation
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Charles H. Becker
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H. Bennett Company
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamar Company, The
Represented By: Todd E. Zimmerman
Represented By: Benjamin J. Hasbrouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael D. McNair
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Thomas M. Stieber
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Kristi K. Brownson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tyler Johnson Siewert
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Charles H. Becker
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Elena D. Harvey, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago-Wilcox Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Emily L. Mugaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Emily L. Mugaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Charles H. Becker
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Iron Fireman, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Manufacturing Company, LLC
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Emily L. Mugaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Bennett
Represented By: Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart
Represented By: Daniel P. Brees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith-Sharpe Company
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane-Johnson Company
Represented By: Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMaster Carr Supply Company
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Process Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Troy A. Wolf
Represented By: Gerald H. Bren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Products Corporation
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Charles H. Becker
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Represented By: Emily L. Mugaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Jamar Company
Represented By: Richard J. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell, Inc.
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Fuller Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: Charles H. Becker
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinkmann Sons Corporation
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCH Newco II, LLC
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWT Air Company, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Claire Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor H. Leeby Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linde, LLC
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Turner, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. McNair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. McCarthy
Represented By: Jesse D. Mondry
Represented By: Peter K. Doely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Cassandra A. Marka
Represented By: Scott J. Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Division of Aqua Chem. Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Brent J. Edison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Piping Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Cassandra A. Marka
Represented By: Scott J. Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Wallock
Represented By: Jeanette Boechler
Represented By: David C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?