LaFountain v. R&R Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeanine LaFountain
Defendant: R&R Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00145
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Judge Peter D. Welte and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by R&R Contracting, Inc.. (as)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to R&R Contracting, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/29/2019. (cjs)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by R&R Contracting, Inc..(Oster, Amy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeanine LaFountain. R&R Contracting, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019 (Frank, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jeanine LaFountain. (as)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jeanine LaFountain. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/26/2019. (as)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to R&R Contracting, Inc. (as)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R&R Contracting, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000411) filed by Jeanine LaFountain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFountain v. R&R Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine LaFountain
Represented By: Steven A. Smith
Represented By: Matthew A. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?