Brookins et al v. Caterpillar Inc.
Plaintiff: Gail Brookins and Ernie Brookins
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00162
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #13 Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) Distributed on 9/24/2019 (pb).
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ernie Brookins, Gail Brookins. (pb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Ernie Brookins, Gail Brookins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint to Join Defendants)(pb)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to File Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Ernie Brookins, Gail Brookins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Cover Sheet)(as)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Hearing re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Swenson, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Hearing re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Caterpillar Inc.. (Dynes, Jane)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ernie Brookins, Gail Brookins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from Ernie Brookins to Baker Law dated 1/16/17, #2 Exhibit 2 - Clerk's Minutes for Status Conference in case 3:16-cv-291, #3 Declaration of Ernie Brookins)(js)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Gail Brookins. (js)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ernie Brookins. (js)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gail Brookins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/23/2019. (js)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ernie Brookins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/23/2019. (js)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Caterpillar Inc. (js)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane L. Dynes on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Dynes, Jane)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Swenson, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Caterpillar Inc.. (Swenson, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Swenson on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Swenson, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Caterpillar Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/12/2019. (js)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caterpillar Inc. from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2019-CV-2291. Filing fee $400 receipt number 319000435 filed by Caterpillar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cass County District Court pleadings)(js) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet - NEF Regenerated) (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brookins et al v. Caterpillar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: David Swenson
Represented By: Kasey D. McNary
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Brookins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Brookins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?