Jenkins v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Brodrick Jamar Jenkins
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00188
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee: IFP conditionally granted at #5 ) filed by Brodrick Jamar Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report of Investigation, #2 Exhibit B - Minnesota Search Warrant)(pb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal conditionally granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets due by November 18, 2019. (AS) Distributed on 10/21/2019 (pb).
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brodrick Jamar Jenkins. (NOTE: Pursuant to Order filed at #3 , Mr. Jenkins was directed to file Motion to proceed IFP or pay $400 filing fee) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2019: #2 Proposed Complaint) (as).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) Distributed on 10/3/2019 (js).
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Brodrick Jenkins (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (lf)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: PRO SE COMPLAINT received incomplete. Request to complete Application to Proceed IFP sent to inmate. (lf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brodrick Jamar Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?